Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2771210

EP2771210 - POWER SAFETY CIRCUIT, INTEGRATED CIRCUIT DEVICE AND SAFETY CRITICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT, EE, ES, SK
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NXP USA, Inc.
6501 William Cannon Drive West
Austin TX 78735 / US
[2018/35]
Former [2016/50]For all designated states
NXP USA, Inc.
6501 William Cannon Drive
Austin TX 78735 / US
Former [2014/36]For all designated states
Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
6501 William Cannon Drive West
Austin, TX 78735 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GIVELIN, Philippe
13 rue de la Quillane
F-31490 Leguevin / FR
02 / BERNON-ENJALBERT, Valérie
521 chemin de Canto Laouzetto
F-31470 Fonsorbes / FR
03 / FOUNAUD, Guillaume
54 avenue de Gameville
F-31650 Saint Orens de Gameville / FR
 [2014/36]
Representative(s)Miles, John Richard
NXP SEMICONDUCTORS
Intellectual Property Group
Abbey House
25 Clarendon Road
Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB
[2018/35]
Former [2014/36]Ferro, Frodo Nunes
Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
c/o Optimus Patents Limited
Grove House
Lutyens Close, Chineham Court
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB
Application number, filing date11817240.227.10.2011
[2018/35]
WO2011IB03298
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013061110
Date:02.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2771210
Date:03.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2013
[2014/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2771210
Date:29.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60R16/02, G06F1/26, H02J1/14, H02J7/14, H02J9/06, B60R16/03
[2014/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LEISTUNGS-SICHERHEITSSCHALTUNG, INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND SICHERHEITSKRITISCHES SYSTEM[2018/12]
English:POWER SAFETY CIRCUIT, INTEGRATED CIRCUIT DEVICE AND SAFETY CRITICAL SYSTEM[2014/36]
French:CIRCUIT DE SÉCURITÉ POUR UN CIRCUIT D'ALIMENTATION, CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ ET SYSTÈME CRITIQUE DE SÉCURITÉ[2018/12]
Former [2014/36]SICHERHEITSSTROMKREIS, INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNG UND SICHERHEITSKRITISCHES SYSTEM
Former [2014/36]CIRCUIT DE SÉCURITÉ POUR ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE, DISPOSITIF À CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ, ET SYSTÈME CRITIQUE DE SÉCURITÉ
Entry into regional phase27.05.2014National basic fee paid 
27.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/36]
08.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.07.2018Fee for grant paid
17.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.09.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
02.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
[2019/23]
Former [2019/22]AL29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
NO29.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NO29.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT29.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2010264743  (JUNG HYUN-CHUL [KR], et al) [X] 1-11 * figure 6 * [Y] 12-15;
 [XY]EP0843398  (WAFERSCALE INTEGRATION INC [US]) [X] 1-11 * figure 1 * [Y] 12-15;
 [YD]US5745670  (LINDE YOSEPH L [US]) [YD] 12-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5745670