Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2608694

EP2608694 - COMPUTER SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.12.2014
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.12.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.01.2015  [2015/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jasney Holdings Pty Ltd
29 Alexandra Road
East Fremantle, Western Australia 6158 / AU
[2013/27]
Inventor(s)01 / CICCOTOSTO, Mario
29 Alexandra Road
East Fremantle, Western Australia 6158 / AU
 [2013/27]
Representative(s)Popp, Eugen , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 47
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/27]Popp, Eugen , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date11819185.723.08.2011
WO2011AU01078
Priority number, dateAU2010090376623.08.2010         Original published format: AU 2010903766
[2013/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012024723
Date:01.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2608694
Date:03.07.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2012
[2013/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU01.03.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:A47B21/04, A47B3/00, A47B23/06, A45F5/00, A47B21/013, B65D5/52
[2013/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/27]
TitleGerman:COMPUTERGEHÄUSE[2013/27]
English:COMPUTER SUPPORT[2013/27]
French:SUPPORT D'ORDINATEUR[2013/27]
Entry into regional phase21.03.2013National basic fee paid 
21.03.2013Search fee paid 
21.03.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/27]
27.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.07.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/04]
02.09.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201303   M06   Fee paid on   11.11.2013
31.08.201404   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2010108726  (HILGENBERG DANIEL) [X] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * * page 1, paragraphs 3,6,14-16 * * page 2, paragraph 35 * * page 3, paragraphs 36,41 * [Y] 6,7;
 [X]US4715293  (COBBS RICHARD W) [X] 1-5,8,9 * abstract * * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 29 *;
 [X]US5706992  (MOOR MARC) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [Y]US6006970  (PIATT JOHN ALLEN) [Y] 6,7 * abstract * * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 19 * * column 3, lines 8-19 *
International search[X]US2009159630  (KO);
 [X]US2009272779  (VU);
 [Y]US6006970  (PIATT);
 [Y]US7778026  (MITCHELL);
 [A]US2005150432  (WEN)