Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2609922

EP2609922 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR TREATING CHRONIC LIVER DISEASE AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shuguang Hospital Affiliated To Shanghai University of Traditional Chinese Medicine
No. 528 Zhang Heng Rd.
Pudong New District
Shanghai 201203 / CN
[2013/27]
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Ping
Dept.of Science&Technology
No. 528 Zhang Heng Rd.
Pudong New District
Shanghai 201203 / CN
 [2016/34]
Former [2013/42]01 / LIU, Ping
YANG, Xuejun
SUN, Mingyu
Dept.of Science&Technology
No. 528 Zhang Heng Rd., Pudong New District
Shanghai 201203 / CN
Former [2013/27]01 / LIU, Pin
YANG, Xuejun
SUN, Mingyu
Dept.of Science&Technology
No. 528 Zhang Heng Rd., Pudong New District
Shanghai 201203 / CN
Representative(s)Petraz, Gilberto Luigi , et al
GLP S.r.l.
Viale Europa Unita, 171
33100 Udine / IT
[2016/36]
Former [2013/27]Petraz, Gilberto Luigi , et al
GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2
33100 Udine / IT
Application number, filing date11819385.304.08.2011
[2016/36]
WO2011CN78013
Priority number, dateCN20101026320526.08.2010         Original published format: CN201010263205
[2013/27]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012025010
Date:01.03.2012
Language:ZH
[2012/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2609922
Date:03.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2609922
Date:07.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN01.03.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/7048, A61K36/481, A61K31/704, A61P1/16, A61P31/14, A61P31/20, A61K36/484
[2014/14]
Former International [2013/27]A61K31/7048, A61K36/481, A61K31/704, A61P1/16, A61P31/14, A61P31/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG CHRONISCHER LEBERERKRANKUNGEN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON[2013/27]
English:PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR TREATING CHRONIC LIVER DISEASE AND USE THEREOF[2013/27]
French:COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE MALADIE CHRONIQUE DU FOIE ET SON UTILISATION[2013/27]
Entry into regional phase11.03.2013Translation filed 
11.03.2013National basic fee paid 
11.03.2013Search fee paid 
11.03.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
11.03.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/27]
03.06.2014Observations by third parties
12.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.12.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
02.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
24.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2016Fee for grant paid
15.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.12.2014
Opposition(s)08.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
01.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.08.2011
AL07.09.2016
AT07.09.2016
CY07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
MK07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/46]HU04.08.2011
AL07.09.2016
AT07.09.2016
CY07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2019/31]HU04.08.2011
AL07.09.2016
AT07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2018/47]AL07.09.2016
AT07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2018/18]AT07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/37]AT07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/32]AT07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/13]ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
Former [2017/11]ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT07.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[XY]CN101744869  ;
 [Y]CN101507779  ;
 [Y]GB2439046  (PHYNOVA LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [Y]JPH06192107  ;
 [Y]CN101062084  ;
 [Y]CN1448497
 [XY]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2010, no. 57, Database accession no. 2010-J68679, XP002720546 & CN101744869 A 20100623 (CHINESE ACAD SCI LANZHOU INST CHEM PHYSI) [X] 1,3 * abstract * [Y] 1-5
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 66, Database accession no. 2009-N05665, XP002720547 & CN101507779 A 20090819 (XI S) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *
 [Y]  - GUI S Y ET AL, "Effects and mechanisms of crude astragalosides fraction on liver fibrosis in rats", MEDICINAL & AROMATIC PLANTS ABSTRACTS, SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS, SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS, NEW DELHI - INDIA, (20060401), vol. 28, no. 2, ISSN 0250-4367, XP018019391 [Y] 1-5 * abstract *
 [Y]  - LIU H ET AL, "Protective effects of astragaloside IV on porcine-serum-induced hepatic fibrosis in rats and in vitro effects on hepatic stellate cells", JOURNAL OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER IRELAND LTD, IE, vol. 122, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.JEP.2009.01.035, ISSN 0378-8741, (20090421), pages 502 - 508, (20090205), XP026034005 [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jep.2009.01.035
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 32, Database accession no. 1994-260431, XP002720550 & JPH06192107 A 19940712 (SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO CO) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2008, no. 27, Database accession no. 2008-D67701, XP002720548 & CN101062084 A 20071031 (HUANG Z) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 06, Database accession no. 2004-054457, XP002720549 & CN1448497 A 20031015 (ZHUANG Y) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *
International search[A]CN1977885  (HUANG ZHENHUA [CN])
 [A]  - HUANG KE'ER ET AL., "Progress In Pharmacological Research on Astragalosides", TRADITIONAL CHINESE DRUG RESEARCH & CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY., (200511), vol. 16, no. IS.6, pages 461 - 463
 [A]  - CHEN, WEIHUA ET AL., "Effects of glycyrrhizic acid on the treatment of liver disease", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF DIGESTIVE DISEASES., (2006), vol. 26, no. IS.2, pages 106 - 109
by applicantCN1539483
 CN1985902
 CN101361782
    - ALA-KOKKO L; PIHLAJANIEMI T; MYERS JC ET AL., "Gene expression of type I, III and IV collagens in liver fibrosis induced by dimethylnitrosamine in the rat", BIOCHEM J, (1987), vol. 244, pages 75 - 9, XP002430226
other   - "SAFOOF-E-KADU", TKDL, Database accession no. BA3/1284D, XP003036067
    - MOHAMMAD AKMAL KHAN, QARAABAADEEN AZAN WA AKMAL, (1897), pages 227 - 228
    - "QURS AMBAR BAARIS", TKDL, Database accession no. KU1/125V87, XP003036068
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, IKSEER AZAM, (1917), vol. III, pages 41 - 43
    - "QURS-E-ZARISHK", TKDL, Database accession no. BA4/1093, XP003036069
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, IKSEER AZAM, (1872), vol. IV, page 156
    - "QAHWA POST KHASHKHAASH", TKDL, Database accession no. NA4/3625, XP003036070
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL KHAN, QARAABAADEEN NAJM-AL-GHANI, (1928), page 550
    - "QURS-E- KAFOOR 4", TKDL, Database accession no. AH2/273, XP003036071
    - ABU ALI IBN-E- SINA, AL-QAANOON-FIL-TIBB, (1996), vol. V, page 126
    - "IYARIJ-E- BAARID-2", TKDL, Database accession no. BA3/03B, XP003036072
    - MOHAMMAD AKMAL KHAN, QARAABAADEEN AZAM WA AKMAL, (1897), page 3
    - "QURS REWAND", TKDL, Database accession no. AH5/2532, XP003036073
    - MOHAMMAD AKMAL KHAN, QARAABAADEEN AZAM WA AKMAL, (1987), page 578
    - "SAFOOF-E-RUBB-AL-SOOS", TKDL, Database accession no. AA7/223, XP003036074
    - ABU BAKR MOHAMMAD ET AL, KITAAB-AL-HAAWI-FIL-TIBB, (1958), vol. VII, page 58
    - "MATBOOKH SHIFA-AL-ASQAAM", TKDL, Database accession no. KU1/101Q, XP003036075
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, IKSEER AZAM, (1917), vol. III, pages 19 - 20