Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2616972

EP2616972 - COMPUTER SYSTEM FOR CALCULATING COUNTRY-SPECIFIC FEES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.09.2016
Database last updated on 23.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2017New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Inovia Holdings Pty Ltd
Level 12, 45 Clarence Street
Sydney, New South Wales 2000 / AU
[2013/30]
Inventor(s)01 / SIMPSON, Justin Ryan
c/o Inovia
Level 12, 45 Clarence Street
Sydney, New South Wales 2000 / AU
02 / SELVARAJ, John Wilfred Adaikalam
c/o Inovia
Level 12, 45 Clarence Street
Sydney, New South Wales 2000 / AU
03 / MEYAPPAN, Aarthy
c/o Inovia
Level 12, 45 Clarence Street
Sydney, New South Wales 2000 / AU
04 / PATEL, Dipti
c/o Inovia
Level 12, 45 Clarence Street
Sydney, New South Wales 2000 / AU
05 / RAY, Sasmita
c/o Inovia
Level 12, 45 Clarence Street
Sydney, New South Wales 2000 / AU
 [2013/30]
Representative(s)Korenberg, Alexander Tal , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
[2013/30]
Application number, filing date11824351.814.09.2011
WO2011AU01178
Priority number, dateAU2010090417816.09.2010         Original published format: AU 2010904178
[2013/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012034172
Date:22.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2616972
Date:24.07.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2012
[2013/30]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
AU22.03.2012
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP20.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, G06Q50/18, G06Q10/10, G06Q30/02, G06Q30/04
[2014/08]
Former International [2013/30]G06F17/30, G06Q50/00, G06Q10/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/30]
TitleGerman:COMPUTERSYSTEM ZUR BERECHNUNG LÄNDERSPEZIFISCHER GEBÜHREN[2013/30]
English:COMPUTER SYSTEM FOR CALCULATING COUNTRY-SPECIFIC FEES[2013/30]
French:SYSTÈME INFORMATIQUE POUR LE CALCUL DE TAXES SPÉCIFIQUES À UN PAYS[2013/30]
Entry into regional phase16.04.2013National basic fee paid 
16.04.2013Search fee paid 
16.04.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
16.04.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/30]
22.08.2013Observations by third parties
23.09.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
20.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.07.2017
22.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
07.07.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.02.2016
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
20.11.2014Request for further processing filed
20.11.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.12.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
16.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
15.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
20.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[L]  - EPO, "Mitteilung des Europäischen Patentamts vom 1. Oktober 2007 über Geschäftsmethoden = Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods = Communiqué de l'Office européen des brevets,en date du 1er octobre 2007, concernant les méthodes dans le domaine des activités", JOURNAL OFFICIEL DE L'OFFICE EUROPEEN DES BREVETS.OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE.AMTSBLATTT DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS, OEB, MUNCHEN, DE, (20071101), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0170-9291, pages 592 - 593, XP007905525 [L] 1-15 * Statement in accordance with the Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods(OJ 11/2007; p592-593) The claimed subject matter, with due regard to the description and drawings, relates to processes comprised in the list of subject matter and activities excluded from patentability under Art.52(2) and (3) EPC. The applicant is advised that in accordance with the established practice of the EPO, no search need be performed in respect of those aspects of the claimed invention. The only identifiable technical aspects of the claimed invention relate to the use of conventional, general-purpose data processing technology for processing data of an inherently non-technical nature. The information technology employed is considered to have been generally known as it was widely available to everyone at the date of filing/priority of the present application. The notoriety of such prior art cannot reasonably be contested. No documentary evidence was therefore considered required. *
International search[X]US2009307577  (LEE EUGENE M [US]);
 [Y]US7016852  (LEE EUGENE M [US]);
 [A]US2010082395  (DE ANDRADE ANTHONY BERNARD [US]);
 [A]US2009241115  (RAFFO LOUISE [GB], et al);
 [A]US2004039668  (LUNDBERG STEVEN W [US])