EP2616894 - SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR AUTOMATIC POWER MANAGEMENT OR REMOTE ELECTRONIC DEVICES USING A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134-1706 / US | [2014/32] |
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states Joulex Inc. 3525 Piedmont Road Seven Piedmont Center, Suite 150 Atlanta, GA 30305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEEBER, Rene An den Vogelwiesen 2a 34132 Kassel / DE | 02 /
BRUNNER, Josef Weltistrasse 40a 81477 München / DE | 03 /
DAVIDSON, Mark 6380 Dodgen Rd. Mableton, GA 30126 / US | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2013/30] | Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11825869.8 | 14.09.2011 | WO2011US51590 | Priority number, date | US20100382764P | 14.09.2010 Original published format: US 382764 P | US201113092670 | 22.04.2011 Original published format: US201113092670 | [2013/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012037249 | Date: | 22.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2616894 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02, G06F1/32 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
G06F1/3209 (EP);
G06F1/3206 (EP);
H02J13/00028 (EP);
H04W4/021 (EP);
H04W4/70 (EP);
H02J2310/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/30] | G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN REMOTE-ENERGIEVERWALTUNG ELEKTRONISCHER VORRICHTUNGEN MITHILFE EINER MOBILVORRICHTUNG | [2013/30] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR AUTOMATIC POWER MANAGEMENT OR REMOTE ELECTRONIC DEVICES USING A MOBILE DEVICE | [2013/30] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉS POUR UNE GESTION AUTOMATIQUE DE LA PUISSANCE OU DE DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRONIQUES DISTANTS AU MOYEN D'UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2013/30] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 02.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 11.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/27] | 16.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010161149 (NGUYEN PHUONG [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0006] , [0017] - [0035]; figures 1,2A,2B *; | [A]US2010217449 (MUSTI SUBRAHMANYAM S [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0051] - [0092]; figure 2 *; | [A] - MOYER D MARPLES S TSANG J KATZ P GURUNG T CHENG A DUTTA TELCORDIA TECHNOLOGIES H SCHULZRINNE COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY ARJUN ROYCHOWDHUR, "Framework Draft for Networked Appliances using the Session Initiation Protocol; draft-moyer-sip-appliances-framework-02.txt", FRAMEWORK DRAFT FOR NETWORKED APPLIANCES USING THE SESSION INITIATION PROTOCOL; DRAFT-MOYER-SIP-APPLIANCES-FRAMEWORK-02.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWI, (20010601), no. 2, XP015032766 [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0004] - [05.1]; figures 4,6 * | International search | [Y]US2005153705 (GRAMAKOV YURI A [RU], et al); | [A]US2009274070 (MUKHERJEE SHANKAR [US], et al); | [Y]US2010087209 (HOLM JUKKA ANTERO [FI], et al); | [A]US2010161149 (NGUYEN PHUONG [US], et al); | [X]US2010218010 (MUSTI SUBRAHMANYAM S [US], et al) |