Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2655935

EP2655935 - LINEAR ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.03.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Linak A/S
Smedevænget 8 Guderup
6430 Nordborg / DK
[2013/44]
Inventor(s)01 / IVERSEN, Torben
Stevningnorvej 9
Stevning
DK-6430 Nordborg / DK
02 / SØRENSEN, René
Hasselbjerg 1
Rinkenaes
DK-6470 Sydals / DK
03 / KNUDSEN, Martin Kahr
Nørregade 31
Lysabild
DK- 6470 Sydals / DK
 [2013/44]
Representative(s)Pedersen, Soeren Skovgaard
Linak A/S
Patent Department
P.O. Box 238
9100 Aalborg / DK
[2015/05]
Former [2013/44]Pedersen, Soeren Skovgaard
Linak A/S Patent Department P.O. Box 238
9100 Aalborg / DK
Application number, filing date11826170.021.12.2011
WO2011DK00152
Priority number, dateDK2010000117321.12.2010         Original published format: DK 201001173
[2013/44]
Filing languageDA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012083951
Date:28.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2655935
Date:30.10.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2012
[2013/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2655935
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:F16H25/20, H02K7/06
[2013/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LINEARANTRIEB[2014/23]
English:LINEAR ACTUATOR[2013/44]
French:ACTIONNEUR LINÉAIRE[2013/44]
Former [2013/44]LINEARER AKTUATOR
Entry into regional phase11.07.2013National basic fee paid 
11.07.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/44]
10.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
10.10.2014Fee for grant paid
10.10.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.10.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.07.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.10.2015  02.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
DewertOkin GmbH
Weststrasse 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
Opponent's representative
Kleine, Hubertus, et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/50]
Opponent(s)01  28.10.2015  02.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
DewertOkin GmbH
Weststrasse 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
Opponent's representative
Kleine, Hubertus, et al
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
08.12.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.06.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.01.2018Date of oral proceedings
02.03.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.03.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition02.05.2018Appeal received No.  T1144/18
29.06.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
16.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.01.2015
AT28.01.2015
CY28.01.2015
CZ28.01.2015
EE28.01.2015
FI28.01.2015
HR28.01.2015
LT28.01.2015
LV28.01.2015
MC28.01.2015
MK28.01.2015
MT28.01.2015
PT28.01.2015
RO28.01.2015
RS28.01.2015
SI28.01.2015
SK28.01.2015
SM28.01.2015
BG28.04.2015
NO28.04.2015
GR29.04.2015
IS28.05.2015
IE21.12.2015
LU21.12.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]AT28.01.2015
CY28.01.2015
CZ28.01.2015
EE28.01.2015
FI28.01.2015
HR28.01.2015
LT28.01.2015
LV28.01.2015
MC28.01.2015
MK28.01.2015
MT28.01.2015
PT28.01.2015
RO28.01.2015
RS28.01.2015
SI28.01.2015
SK28.01.2015
SM28.01.2015
BG28.04.2015
NO28.04.2015
GR29.04.2015
IS28.05.2015
IE21.12.2015
LU21.12.2015
Former [2017/39]AT28.01.2015
CY28.01.2015
CZ28.01.2015
EE28.01.2015
FI28.01.2015
HR28.01.2015
LT28.01.2015
LV28.01.2015
MC28.01.2015
MT28.01.2015
RO28.01.2015
RS28.01.2015
SI28.01.2015
SK28.01.2015
SM28.01.2015
BG28.04.2015
NO28.04.2015
GR29.04.2015
IS28.05.2015
IE21.12.2015
LU21.12.2015
Former [2016/45]AT28.01.2015
CZ28.01.2015
EE28.01.2015
FI28.01.2015
HR28.01.2015
LT28.01.2015
LV28.01.2015
MC28.01.2015
RO28.01.2015
RS28.01.2015
SI28.01.2015
SK28.01.2015
BG28.04.2015
NO28.04.2015
GR29.04.2015
IS28.05.2015
IE21.12.2015
LU21.12.2015
Former [2016/34]AT28.01.2015
CZ28.01.2015
EE28.01.2015
FI28.01.2015
HR28.01.2015
LT28.01.2015
LV28.01.2015
MC28.01.2015
RO28.01.2015
RS28.01.2015
SI28.01.2015
SK28.01.2015
BG28.04.2015
NO28.04.2015
GR29.04.2015
IS28.05.2015
LU21.12.2015
Former [2016/33]AT28.01.2015
CZ28.01.2015
EE28.01.2015
FI28.01.2015
HR28.01.2015
LT28.01.2015
LV28.01.2015
MC28.01.2015
RO28.01.2015
RS28.01.2015
SI28.01.2015
SK28.01.2015
BG28.04.2015
NO28.04.2015
GR29.04.2015
IS28.05.2015
Former [2016/12]AT28.01.2015
CZ28.01.2015
EE28.01.2015
FI28.01.2015
HR28.01.2015
LT28.01.2015
LV28.01.2015
RO28.01.2015
RS28.01.2015
SI28.01.2015
SK28.01.2015
BG28.04.2015
NO28.04.2015
GR29.04.2015
IS28.05.2015
Former [2015/49]AT28.01.2015
CZ28.01.2015
EE28.01.2015
FI28.01.2015
HR28.01.2015
LT28.01.2015
LV28.01.2015
RO28.01.2015
RS28.01.2015
SK28.01.2015
BG28.04.2015
NO28.04.2015
GR29.04.2015
IS28.05.2015
Former [2015/39]AT28.01.2015
FI28.01.2015
HR28.01.2015
LT28.01.2015
LV28.01.2015
RS28.01.2015
BG28.04.2015
NO28.04.2015
GR29.04.2015
IS28.05.2015
Former [2015/38]AT28.01.2015
FI28.01.2015
HR28.01.2015
LT28.01.2015
BG28.04.2015
NO28.04.2015
GR29.04.2015
IS28.05.2015
Former [2015/37]FI28.01.2015
HR28.01.2015
LT28.01.2015
BG28.04.2015
NO28.04.2015
GR29.04.2015
Former [2015/36]FI28.01.2015
HR28.01.2015
LT28.01.2015
BG28.04.2015
NO28.04.2015
Former [2015/35]LT28.01.2015
NO28.04.2015
Cited inInternational search[X]US2008289442  (KAWADA DAISAKU [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0205]; figures 2-4 *;
 [AD]WO0229284  (LINAK AS [DK], et al) [AD] 1-12 * the whole document *