Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2620718

EP2620718 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR AIR-COOLING AND HOT-WATER SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/31]AIR-COOLING HOT-WATER SUPPLY DEVICE AND AIR-COOLING HOT-WATER SUPPLY METHOD
[2016/09]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2016/38]
Former [2013/31]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAMAKI, Shogo
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / SAITO, Makoto
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2013/31]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[2016/38]
Former [2013/31]Gleiter, Hermann
Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 13
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date11826599.008.03.2011
[2016/38]
WO2011JP55373
Priority number, dateJP2010021044621.09.2010         Original published format: JP 2010210446
[2013/31]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012039153
Date:29.03.2012
Language:JA
[2012/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2620718
Date:31.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2620718
Date:21.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.03.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:F24D19/10, F24F5/00, F24F11/06, F24F11/00, F25B13/00
[2016/09]
Former International [2014/43]F24D19/10, F24H1/00, F25B29/00, F25B13/00
Former International [2013/31]F24H1/00, F25B29/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR LUFTKÜHLUNG UND HEISSWASSERZUFUHR[2016/09]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR AIR-COOLING AND HOT-WATER SUPPLY[2016/09]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE REFROIDISSEMENT D'AIR ET ALIMENTATION EN EAU CHAUDE[2016/09]
Former [2013/31]VORRICHTUNG ZUR LUFTKÜHLUNG EINER HEISSWASSERZUFUHR UND VERFAHREN ZUR LUFTKÜHLUNG EINER HEISSWASSERZUFUHR
Former [2013/31]AIR-COOLING HOT-WATER SUPPLY DEVICE AND AIR-COOLING HOT-WATER SUPPLY METHOD
Former [2013/31]DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION EN EAU CHAUDE ET REFROIDISSEMENT PAR L'AIR ET PROCÉDÉ D'ALIMENTATION EN EAU CHAUDE ET REFROIDISSEMENT PAR L'AIR
Entry into regional phase06.03.2013Translation filed 
06.03.2013National basic fee paid 
06.03.2013Search fee paid 
06.03.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
06.03.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/31]
18.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2016Fee for grant paid
10.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.05.2015
Opposition(s)22.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL21.09.2016
AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
IE08.03.2017
LU08.03.2017
MT08.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
[2018/47]
Former [2018/43]AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
IE08.03.2017
LU08.03.2017
MT08.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/13]AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
IE08.03.2017
LU08.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/10]AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
LU08.03.2017
Former [2017/52]AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/32]AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
NO21.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
NO21.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT21.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0151493  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0052] , [0054] , [0099] , [0100]; figures 16,25 *;
 [A]US6668572  (SEO KOOK-JEONG [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0026]; figure 3A *;
 [A]JPS59231354  (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
International search[A]JP2001248937  (TOSHIBA CARRIER KK);
 [A]JPS60240968  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP);
 [A]JPS61107065  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP);
 [A]JPS61107066  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP);
 [A]JP2010196955  (DAIKIN IND LTD)
by applicantJPH01159569
 JPH0676864B
 JP2001248937