Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2619737

EP2619737 - DISPLAY FOR HAND-HELD ELECTRONICS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.06.2013
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2019New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mobile Tech, Inc.
5665 Meadows, Suite 150
Lake Oswego, OR 97035 / US
[2017/04]
Former [2013/31]For all designated states
Merchandising Technologies Inc.
1050 NW 229th Avenue
Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HENSON, Donald
1050 NW 229th Avenue
Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US
02 / ALLISON, Thaine
1050 NW 229th Avenue
Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US
03 / GOLDBERG, Jason
1050 Nw 229th Avenue
Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US
04 / OLSON, Justin
1050 NW 229th Avenue
Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US
05 / PITT, Eric
1050 NW 229th Avenue
Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US
06 / SCHATZ, Kris
1050 NW 229th Avenue
Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US
07 / WHEELER, Wade
1050 NW 229th Avenue
Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US
 [2017/09]
Former [2013/31]01 / HENSON, Donald
1050 NW 229th Avenue
Hillsboro OR 97124 / US
02 / ALLISON, Thaine
1050 NW 229th Avenue
Hillsboro OR 97124 / US
03 / GOLDBERG, Jason
1050 Nw 229th Avenue
Hillsboro OR 97124 / US
04 / OLSON, Justin
1050 NW 229th Avenue
Hillsboro OR 97124 / US
05 / PITT, Eric
1050 NW 229th Avenue
Hiilsboro OR 97124 / US
06 / SCHATZ, Kris
1050 NW 229th Avenue
Hillsboro OR 97124 / US
07 / WHEELER, Wade
1050 NW 229th Avenue
Hillsboro OR 97124 / US
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/31]D'Halleweyn, Nele Veerle Trees Gertrudis , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date11827111.319.05.2011
WO2011US37235
Priority number, dateUS2010088810722.09.2010         Original published format: US 888107
[2013/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012039794
Date:29.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2619737
Date:31.07.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2012
[2013/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.03.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:G08B13/14, H01Q1/44
[2017/48]
Former International [2013/31]G08B1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/31]
TitleGerman:ANZEIGE FÜR TRAGBARE ELEKTRONIK[2013/31]
English:DISPLAY FOR HAND-HELD ELECTRONICS[2013/31]
French:PRÉSENTOIR POUR DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRONIQUES PORTATIFS[2013/31]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2013National basic fee paid 
21.01.2013Search fee paid 
21.01.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/31]
22.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Appeal following examination21.05.2018Appeal received No.  J0015/18
03.08.2018Statement of grounds filed
22.05.2019Date of oral proceedings
28.05.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP16206866.2  / EP3171345
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
24.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[YA]US2008169923  (BELDEN DENNIS D [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0020] , [0032] , [0035] , [0043] * [A] 4;
 [YA]WO2009042905  (CHECKPOINT SYSTEMS INC [US]; RAPP MICHAEL [DE]; BRENNER RAINER [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * figure 2 * * page 6, lines 3-12 * [A] 4;
 [A]US6386906  (BURKE PAUL C [US]) [A] 4 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * claim 1 * * column 3, lines 6-14 * * column 5, lines 61-67 * * column 6, lines 6-18 *;
 [A]GB2427056  (SEKURE CONTROLS INC [US]) [A] 4 * figures 1,5 * * abstract * * page 4, lines 15-20 *;
 [A]US2007229259  (IRMSCHER JULIA [DE] ET AL) [A] 4 * paragraph [0013] *;
 [A]GB2440600  (CALLAGHAN PAUL DOMINIC [GB]) [A] 4 * figure 3 * * abstract *;
 [A]US2006001541  (LEYDEN ROGER [US] ET AL) [A] 4 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0080] *;
 [A]US2007075914  (BATES FRANK [US]) [A] 4 * abstract *;
 [A]US2005113036  (LITA EDWARD [US]) [A] 4 * abstract *
International search[Y]US6386906  (BURKE);
 [Y]US2008169923  (BELDEN ET AL);
 [Y]US2007229259  (IRMSCHER ET AL);
 [Y]US2007075914  (BATES);
 [Y]GB2440600  (CALLAGHAN);
 [A]US2001049222  (FORT ET AL)