Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2619719

EP2619719 - PREDICTIVE CUSTOMER SERVICE ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.08.2018  [2018/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
24/7 Customer, Inc.
910 E. Hamilton Avenue Suite 240
Campbell, CA 95008 / US
[2013/31]
Inventor(s)01 / AJMERA, Dinesh
Apt. 2096 Sobha Primrose
Outer Ring Road
Bellandur
Bangalore 560 103 / IN
02 / PANDA, Debashish
594/1, 12th Cross
1st Main
Mico Layout
BTM 2nd Stage
Bangalore 560 076 / IN
03 / GHANSHANI, Pankaj
126 Swastik Kunj
Sector 13
Rohini
Delhi 110 085 / IN
04 / KUMAR, Sumit
C/304, Gem Regency
Nirguna Mandir Layout
Koramangala 4th Block
St Bed Layout
Bangalore 560 034 / IN
05 / VIJAYARAGHAVAN, Ravi
210 D Block
Raheja Residencey
7th Cross
3rd Block, Koramangala
Bangalore 560 034 / IN
06 / RAMACHANDRAN, Mathangi, Sri
J501 Mantri Tranquil Apartments
Gubbalala Village Gate
Off Kanakapura Road
Bangalore 560 061 / IN
 [2013/31]
Representative(s)Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/31]Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann
Stöckeler, Zinkler & Partner
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Application number, filing date11827608.823.09.2011
WO2011US52977
Priority number, dateUS20100385866P23.09.2010         Original published format: US 385866 P
US20111323919521.09.2011         Original published format: US201113239195
[2013/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012040575
Date:29.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/13]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2619719
Date:31.07.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2012
[2013/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.05.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/02, G06Q10/10, H04L12/18, H04L12/58
[2014/24]
Former International [2013/31]G06Q30/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/31]
TitleGerman:PRÄDIKTIVE KUNDENSERVICE-UMGEBUNG[2013/31]
English:PREDICTIVE CUSTOMER SERVICE ENVIRONMENT[2013/31]
French:ENVIRONNEMENT DE SERVICE CLIENT PRÉDICTIF[2013/31]
Entry into regional phase22.03.2013National basic fee paid 
22.03.2013Search fee paid 
22.03.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
22.03.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/31]
08.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/35]
25.04.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/35]
Divisional application(s)EP17156478.4  / EP3185198
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.09.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201707   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]US2009222313  (KANNAN PALLIPURAM V [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0050] *;
 [A]US2009249279  (BOURDON OLIVIER [FR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0058] *
International search[Y]US2009222313  (KANNAN PALLIPURAM V [US], et al);
 [Y]US2009249279  (BOURDON OLIVIER [FR]);
 [A]US2010191658  (KANNAN PALLIPURAM V [US], et al);
 [A]US2010138282  (KANNAN PALLIPURAM V [US], et al);
 [A]US7631007  (MORRIS ROBERT P [US])