blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2623556

EP2623556 - DRIPPING INHIBITOR AND RESIN COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  26.02.2021
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.02.2021Refusal of applicationpublished on 31.03.2021  [2021/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
[2013/32]
Inventor(s)01 / YAMANAKA Taku
c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD.
Umeda Center Building
4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi
2-Chome, Kita-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
02 / MIYAMOTO Masayoshi
c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD.
Umeda Center Building
4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi
2-Chome, Kita-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
03 / KASAI Shunji
c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD.
Umeda Center Building
4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi
2-Chome, Kita-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
04 / TSUJI Masayuki
c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD.
Umeda Center Building
4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi
2-Chome, Kita-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
05 / KAWAHARA Kazuya
c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD.
Umeda Center Building
4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi
2-Chome, Kita-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
06 / YAMAUCHI Mayumi
c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD.
Umeda Center Building
4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi
2-Chome, Kita-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
07 / KATO Taketo
c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD.
Umeda Center Building
4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi
2-Chome, Kita-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
08 / SAWADA Yasuhiko
c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD.
Umeda Center Building
4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi
2-Chome, Kita-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
 [2013/32]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/32]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date11829307.529.09.2011
WO2011JP72446
Priority number, dateJP2010022314830.09.2010         Original published format: JP 2010223148
[2013/32]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2012043754
Date:05.04.2012
Language:JA
[2012/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2623556
Date:07.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.04.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2015
ClassificationIPC:C08L27/18, C08L69/00, C08L101/00
[2013/32]
CPC:
C08L69/00 (EP,US); C08F214/26 (EP,US); C08J3/16 (EP,US);
C08J3/203 (EP,US); C08L27/18 (US); C08L27/22 (US);
C08L67/02 (EP,US); C08J2327/18 (EP,US); C08J2369/00 (EP,US);
C08J2427/18 (EP,US); Y10T428/2982 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C08F214/26, C08F2/26 (US,EP);
C08L67/02, C08L27/18 (EP,US);
C08L69/00, C08L27/18 (US,EP);
C08F214/26, C08F214/28 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/32]
TitleGerman:TROPFHEMMER UND HARZVERBINDUNG[2013/32]
English:DRIPPING INHIBITOR AND RESIN COMPOUND[2013/32]
French:INHIBITEUR DE DÉGOUTTEMENT ET COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE[2013/32]
Entry into regional phase11.03.2013Translation filed 
11.03.2013National basic fee paid 
11.03.2013Search fee paid 
11.03.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
11.03.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/32]
28.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
12.07.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
18.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/13]
18.01.2021Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/13]
Appeal following examination18.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2700/17
28.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
18.01.2021Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
10.02.2021Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
18.01.2021Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.06.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
18.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
16.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
25.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
24.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
23.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
14.09.2020Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2008275188  (PARK JI-HO [KR]) [X] 1-5 * example 2 *;
 [XY]EP0861856  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * example - * * example CE1 CE2; table 1 * [Y] 1;
 [Y]EP1816148  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1 * the whole document *
International search[X]WO9717382  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al);
 [A]WO2006054612  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al);
 [A]JPS56131629  (HOECHST AG);
 [A]JPS49115190  (DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD.)
by applicantJPS5044241
 JPS5936657B
 JPS6038418B
 JPS6258629B
 JPS6460181
 JPS6155145
 JPS61261352
 JPS63278961
 JPH0232154
 JPS61127759
 JPH05186686
 JPH05214184
 JPH06306212
 JPH07324147
 JPS60258263
 JPH0995583
 JPH10310707
 JPH1077378
 WO9717382
 JP4414466B
 JP2005298581
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.