Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2624068

EP2624068 - DEVELOPER SUPPLY CONTAINER AND DEVELOPER SUPPLY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.11.2019
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2013/32]For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MURAKAMI Katsuya
c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
02 / NAGASHIMA Toshiaki
c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
03 / TAZAWA Fumio
c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
04 / OKINO Ayatomo
c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
05 / YAMADA Yusuke
c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
06 / NAKAJIMA Nobuo
c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
07 / ISOMURA Tetsuo
c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
 [2013/32]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2013/32]
Application number, filing date11829425.529.09.2011
WO2011JP73028
Priority number, dateJP2011021239428.09.2011         Original published format: JP 2011212394
JP2010021810429.09.2010         Original published format: JP 2010218104
[2013/32]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012043875
Date:05.04.2012
Language:JA
[2012/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2624068
Date:07.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.04.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:G03G21/16, G03G15/08
[2019/10]
Former International [2013/32]G03G15/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/32]
TitleGerman:ENTWICKLERZUFUHRBEHÄLTER UND ENTWICKLERZUFUHRSYSTEM[2013/32]
English:DEVELOPER SUPPLY CONTAINER AND DEVELOPER SUPPLY SYSTEM[2013/32]
French:RÉCIPIENT ET SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION EN RÉVÉLATEUR[2013/32]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2013Translation filed 
29.04.2013National basic fee paid 
29.04.2013Search fee paid 
29.04.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
29.04.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/32]
13.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
04.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.01.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
02.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
01.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
30.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]US5446478  (LARSON OVE [SE]) [X] 1-23 * column 4, lines 14-22; figures 1,2,4,5 * * column 3, lines 35-46 *
International search[A]JPH04143781  (CANON KK);
 [A]JPH0659572  (RICOH KK);
 [A]JPH06130812  (RICOH KK);
 [A]JPH04505899  (ARRAY PRINTERS AB.);
 [A]JPH11237789  (RICOH KK);
 [A]JP2009175703  (RICOH KK);
 [A]JP2009128429  (RICOH KK);
 [A]JP2000147884  (RICOH KK);
 [A]JPH06250520  (RICOH KK)
by applicantJPS636464U
 JP2002072649