Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2624773

EP2624773 - MINIMALLY INVASIVE INTERVERTEBRAL SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.02.2019
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EIT Emerging Implant Technologies GmbH
Eisenbahnstrasse 84
78573 Wurmlingen / DE
[2019/11]
Former [2013/33]For all designated states
Lorio, Morgan
110 Gallaway Road
Bristol, TN 37620 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PURCELL, Thomas
5818 El Camino Real
Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US
 [2013/33]
Representative(s)Curran, Clair , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/33]KIPA AB
P O Box 1065
251 10 Helsingborg / SE
Application number, filing date11831342.829.09.2011
WO2011US54001
Priority number, dateUS20100389986P05.10.2010         Original published format: US 389986 P
[2013/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012047712
Date:12.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2624773
Date:14.08.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2012
[2013/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.04.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/70
[2013/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/33]
TitleGerman:MINIMAL INVASIVE BANDSCHEIBENSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR[2013/33]
English:MINIMALLY INVASIVE INTERVERTEBRAL SYSTEMS AND METHODS[2013/33]
French:SYSTÈMES INTERVERTÉBRAUX MINIMALEMENT INVASIFS ET PROCÉDÉS[2013/33]
Entry into regional phase30.04.2013National basic fee paid 
30.04.2013Search fee paid 
30.04.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
30.04.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/33]
03.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.02.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201808   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]US7513900  (CARRISON HAROLD F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6 * column 7, line 36 - column 10, line 18; figures 10, 11, 16, 17 *;
 [X]WO2007076377  (STOUT MEDICAL GROUP LP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,15 * paragraphs [0018] - [0042] * * paragraphs [0055] - [0057] * * paragraph [0022] * * figures 1-3, 8, 9 *;
 [XA]WO2009125242  (VEXIM [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,15 * paragraphs [0088] - [0095]; figures 1A-2B * [A] 6,7;
 [X]US7621950  (GLOBERMAN OREN [IL], et al) [X] 1-5,15 * column 14, line 43 - column 16, line 10; figures 1A-2D *;
 [X]US2008243255  (BUTLER MICHAEL S [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,15 * paragraphs [0031] - [0038]; figures 1-8 *
International search[X]US7513900  (CARRISON HAROLD F [US], et al);
 [Y]US6039761  (LI LEHMANN K [US], et al);
 [Y]US2008015701  (GARCIA JAVIER [US], et al);
 [Y]US7445636  (MICHELSON GARY K [US])