Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2629342

EP2629342 - UNSATURATED POLYESTER RESIN COMPOSITION FOR USE IN LED REFLECTOR, AND LED REFLECTOR AND LED LUMINAIRE USING SAID COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.07.2015
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2013/34]
Inventor(s)01 / NAGAOKA Sunao
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Center
Planning and Managment Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / KUBO Toshio
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Center
Planning and Managment Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2014/38]
Former [2014/23]01 / NAGAOKA Sunao
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Center
Planning and Managment Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / KUBO Toshio
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Center
Planning and Managment Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
Former [2013/34]01 / NAGAOKA Sunao
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Center
IP Development Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / KUBO Toshio
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Center
IP Development Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
Representative(s)Appelt, Christian W.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/38]Appelt, Christian W.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2013/34]Appelt, Christian W.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date11834094.214.06.2011
WO2011JP63594
Priority number, dateJP2011008791012.04.2011         Original published format: JP 2011087910
JP2010023802622.10.2010         Original published format: JP 2010238026
[2013/34]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012053249
Date:26.04.2012
Language:JA
[2012/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2629342
Date:21.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2629342
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.04.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01L33/60, C08F283/01, C08K13/02, C08L67/06
[2013/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/34]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:UNGESÄTTIGTE POLYESTERHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG IN LED-REFLEKTOR UND LICHTREFLEKTOR UND LED-LEUCHTE MIT BESAGTER[2013/34]
English:UNSATURATED POLYESTER RESIN COMPOSITION FOR USE IN LED REFLECTOR, AND LED REFLECTOR AND LED LUMINAIRE USING SAID COMPOSITION[2013/34]
French:COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE EN POLYESTER INSATURÉ UTILISÉE DANS LES RÉFLECTEURS DE DEL, ET RÉFLECTEUR DE DEL ET LUMINAIRE À DEL UTILISANT LADITE COMPOSITION[2013/34]
Entry into regional phase14.05.2013Translation filed 
14.05.2013National basic fee paid 
14.05.2013Search fee paid 
14.05.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
14.05.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/34]
23.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.2014Fee for grant paid
28.04.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.02.2014
Opposition(s)18.06.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.06.2011
AL17.09.2014
AT17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MK17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
GB14.06.2015
IE14.06.2015
LU14.06.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU14.06.2011
AT17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MK17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
GB14.06.2015
IE14.06.2015
LU14.06.2015
Former [2017/39]HU14.06.2011
AT17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
GB14.06.2015
IE14.06.2015
LU14.06.2015
Former [2017/03]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
GB14.06.2015
IE14.06.2015
LU14.06.2015
Former [2016/23]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
GB14.06.2015
IE14.06.2015
LU14.06.2015
Former [2016/20]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
IE14.06.2015
LU14.06.2015
Former [2016/11]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
LU14.06.2015
Former [2016/09]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/51]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/35]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/25]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/24]CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/23]CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/22]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/12]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
Former [2015/10]FI17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
Former [2015/09]FI17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
Former [2015/08]LT17.09.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS55112225  ;
 [A]JPS5667359
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1980, no. 41, Database accession no. 1980-72540C, XP002715476 & JPS55112225 A 19800829 (TOYOBO KK) [A] 1-11 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1981, no. 30, Database accession no. 1981-54023D, XP002715477 & JPS5667359 A 19810606 (SEKISUI CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract *
International search[A]JP2010235756  (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD);
 [A]JP2008255338  (NIPPON GOSEI KAKO KK, et al);
 [A]JPH01182316  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD);
 [A]JP2010049918  (SHOWA HIGHPOLYMER, et al);
 [A]WO2006095414  (SHOWA HIGHPOLYMER [JP], et al)
by applicantWO2006013899
 JPH06200153
 JP2002374007
 JP2010100682