EP2635058 - METHOD AND MOBILE TERMINAL FOR SETTING LANGUAGE THROUGH MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2016/30] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Hui ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2016/30] |
Former [2013/36] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patentanwälte Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 11835468.7 | 21.02.2011 | [2016/30] | WO2011CN71126 | Priority number, date | CN201010523690 | 28.10.2010 Original published format: CN201010523690 | [2013/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012055194 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2635058 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2635058 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
H04W4/025 (EP,US);
H04M1/72457 (EP,US);
H04M2250/58 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/36] | H04W8/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILES ENDGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR EINSTELLUNG EINER SPRACHE AUF DEM MOBILEN ENDGERÄT | [2013/36] | English: | METHOD AND MOBILE TERMINAL FOR SETTING LANGUAGE THROUGH MOBILE TERMINAL | [2013/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET TERMINAL MOBILE POUR RÉGLER UNE LANGUE PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE DU TERMINAL MOBILE | [2013/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2013 | Translation filed | 27.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 26.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.02.2011 | AL | 27.07.2016 | AT | 27.07.2016 | BE | 27.07.2016 | CY | 27.07.2016 | CZ | 27.07.2016 | DK | 27.07.2016 | EE | 27.07.2016 | ES | 27.07.2016 | FI | 27.07.2016 | HR | 27.07.2016 | IT | 27.07.2016 | LT | 27.07.2016 | LV | 27.07.2016 | MC | 27.07.2016 | MK | 27.07.2016 | NL | 27.07.2016 | PL | 27.07.2016 | RO | 27.07.2016 | RS | 27.07.2016 | SE | 27.07.2016 | SI | 27.07.2016 | SK | 27.07.2016 | SM | 27.07.2016 | TR | 27.07.2016 | BG | 27.10.2016 | NO | 27.10.2016 | GR | 28.10.2016 | IS | 27.11.2016 | PT | 28.11.2016 | IE | 21.02.2017 | LU | 21.02.2017 | MT | 21.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 21.02.2011 | |
AL | 27.07.2016 | ||
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 21.02.2017 | ||
LU | 21.02.2017 | ||
MT | 21.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 21.02.2011 | |
AL | 27.07.2016 | ||
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 21.02.2017 | ||
LU | 21.02.2017 | ||
MT | 21.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.02.2011 | |
AL | 27.07.2016 | ||
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 21.02.2017 | ||
LU | 21.02.2017 | ||
MT | 21.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.02.2011 | |
AL | 27.07.2016 | ||
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 21.02.2017 | ||
LU | 21.02.2017 | ||
MT | 21.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 27.07.2016 | |
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 21.02.2017 | ||
LU | 21.02.2017 | ||
MT | 21.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 21.02.2017 | ||
LU | 21.02.2017 | ||
MT | 21.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 21.02.2017 | ||
LU | 21.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
LU | 21.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 27.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006089129 (HURST LEON [FI]) [X] 1,3-5,9 * paragraphs [0164] - [0169]; figure 11 *; | [XYI]WO2009008274 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10 * page 7, lines 3-21; figure 1 * * page 8, lines 11-24; figure 2 * * page 15, lines 1-21; figure 5 * * page 21, line 26 - page 24, line 6; figures 5,6,8 * [Y] 6,8 [I] 7; | [Y]EP2169543 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 6,8 * abstract ** paragraph [0044]; figure 6B * | International search | [A]CN1242664 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [A]CN1505371 (AVAYA TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]); | [X]CN101754367 (KONKA GROUP CO LTD); | [XP]CN101938694 (HUIZHOU TCL MOBILE COMM CO LTD) |