EP2633880 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A DEVICE FOR DELIVERING A SUBSTANCE TO BE INTRODUCED, AND METHOD FOR DELIVERING A SUBSTANCE TO BE INTRODUCED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Ritsumeikan Trust 8 Nishinokyo-Higashi-Togano-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8520 / JP | For all designated states Kyoto University 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | [2013/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMIZU, Kazunori C/O Graduate School of Pharmaceutical Sciences Kyoto University 46-29, Yoshida-Shimoadachi-cho Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 02 /
KONISHI, Satoshi c/o Faculty of Science and Engineering Ritsumeikan University Biwako-Kusatsu Campus 1-1-1, Nojihigashi Kusatsu-shi Shiga 525-8577 / JP | 03 /
KAWAKAMI, Shigeru C/O Graduate School of Pharmaceutical Sciences Kyoto University 46-29, Yoshida-Shimoadachi-cho Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 04 /
HASHIDA, Mitsuru C/O Graduate School of Pharmaceutical Sciences Kyoto University 46-29, Yoshida-Shimoadachi-cho Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | De Clercq, Ann G. Y., et al De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2013/36] | Application number, filing date | 11835898.5 | 26.05.2011 | WO2011JP62102 | Priority number, date | JP20100238885 | 25.10.2010 Original published format: JP 2010238885 | [2013/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012056756 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2633880 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61M37/00 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
A61M5/14593 (EP,US);
A61M5/00 (US);
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61M5/148 (EP,US);
A61M60/126 (EP,US);
A61M60/289 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERABREICHUNG EINER EINZUFÜHRENDEN SUBSTANZ UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERABREICHUNG EINER EINZUFÜHRENDEN SUBSTANZ | [2013/36] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A DEVICE FOR DELIVERING A SUBSTANCE TO BE INTRODUCED, AND METHOD FOR DELIVERING A SUBSTANCE TO BE INTRODUCED | [2013/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION D'UNE SUBSTANCE À INTRODUIRE, ET PROCÉDÉ D'ADMINISTRATION D'UNE SUBSTANCE À INTRODUIRE | [2013/36] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2013 | Translation filed | 21.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 21.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 22.03.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH11505112 (THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY); | [Y]JP2005040606 (CORDIS CORP); | [Y]WO2005077317 (CMS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]JP2009057329 (ADERANS HOLDINGS CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2006501177 | - SIMON J. EASTMAN ET AL., "Development of catheter-based procedures for transducing the isolated rabbit liver with plasmid DNA", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (20021120), vol. 13, pages 2065 - 2077 | - SE KHORSANDI ET AL., "Minimally invasive and selective hydrodynamic gene therapy of liver segments in the pig and human", CANCER GENE THERAPY, (2008), vol. 15, pages 225 - 230 | - T. NOMURA ET AL., "Gene expression and antitumor effects following direct interferon (IFN)-y gene transfer with naked plasmid DNA and DC- chol liposome complexes in mice", GENE THERAPY, (199901), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 121 - 129 |