Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2636642

EP2636642 - CNT DISPERSION LIQUID, CNT COMPACT, CNT COMPOSITION, CNT ASSEMBLY, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING EACH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2013
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2018Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology
3-1 Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8921 / JP
[2013/37]
Inventor(s)01 / HATA Kenji
c/o NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF ADVANCED INDUSTRIAL
SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY
Tsukuba Central 5
1-1 Higashi 1-chome
Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8565 / JP
02 / KOBASHI Kazufumi
c/o NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF ADVANCED INDUSTRIAL
SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY
Tsukuba Central 5
1-1 Higashi 1-chome
Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8565 / JP
03 / FUTABA Don N.
c/o NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF ADVANCED INDUSTRIAL
SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY
Tsukuba Central 5
1-1 Higashi 1-chome
Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8565 / JP
 [2013/37]
Representative(s)Ilgart, Jean-Christophe , et al
BREVALEX
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/37]Ilgart, Jean-Christophe , et al
BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
Application number, filing date11838104.504.11.2011
WO2011JP75511
Priority number, dateJP2010024914005.11.2010         Original published format: JP 2010249140
[2013/37]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012060454
Date:10.05.2012
Language:JA
[2012/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2636642
Date:11.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP10.05.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:C01B32/174, B82Y30/00, B82Y40/00, C04B35/528, C04B35/626, C08K3/04
[2017/52]
Former International [2013/37]C01B31/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/37]
TitleGerman:CNT-DISPERSIONSFLÜSSIGKEIT, CNT-PRESSLING, CNT-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, CNT-ANORDNUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR ALLES[2013/37]
English:CNT DISPERSION LIQUID, CNT COMPACT, CNT COMPOSITION, CNT ASSEMBLY, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING EACH[2013/37]
French:LIQUIDE DE DISPERSION DE NANOTUBES DE CARBONE, COMPACT DE NANOTUBES DE CARBONE, COMPOSITION DE NANOTUBES DE CARBONE, ASSEMBLAGE DE NANOTUBES DE CARBONE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CHACUN DE CES ÉLÉMENTS[2013/37]
Entry into regional phase03.05.2013Translation filed 
03.05.2013National basic fee paid 
03.05.2013Search fee paid 
03.05.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
03.05.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/37]
11.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
26.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
24.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2154108  (KURARAY CO [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,14,17-19,21-24,27,32,33 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0070]; examples 1, comparative example 1 *;
 [X]EP2151415  (UNIV KYUSHU NAT UNIV CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5,14,17-19,21-24,27,32,33 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0031]; example 1 *;
 [X]WO2010047365  (KURARAY CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5,14,17-19,21-24,27,32,33 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0074] *;
 [XP]EP2361880  (KURARAY CO [JP]) [XP] 1,3-5,14,17-19,21-24,27,32,33 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0074] *
International search[A]JP2007534588  (EIKOS, INC.);
 [A]JP2008201626  (TORAY INDUSTRIES);
 [A]JP2009149832  (TORAY INDUSTRIES);
 [A]JP2007169120  (INCTEC INC)
by applicantJP2009149832
 JP2007169120