Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2590514

EP2590514 - CHOCOLATE MASS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.06.2015
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Coy, Johannes
Kroetengasse 10
64853 Otzberg / DE
[2013/45]
Former [2013/30]For all designated states
MD&D Alliance GmbH
Holzhofallee 14
64295 Darmstadt / DE
Former [2013/20]For all designated states
Coy, Johannes
Kroetengasse 10
64853 Otzberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2013/45]
Former [2013/44]01 / CoY, Johannes
Kroetengasse 10
64853 Otzberg
64853 Otzberg / DE
Former [2013/20]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Rudolph, Ulrike
Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. U. Rudolph
In der Schanz 10
69198 Schriesheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/20]Rudolph, Ulrike
Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. U. Rudolph In der Schanz 10
69198 Schriesheim / DE
Application number, filing date11838978.215.12.2011
WO2011DE02131
Priority number, dateDE2011100801606.01.2011         Original published format: DE102011008016
[2013/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012092916
Date:12.07.2012
Language:DE
[2012/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2590514
Date:15.05.2013
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2012
[2013/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2590514
Date:06.08.2014
Language:DE
[2014/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:A23G1/40, A23G1/42
[2013/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHOKOLADENMASSE[2013/20]
English:CHOCOLATE MASS[2013/20]
French:MATIÈRE DE CHOCOLAT[2013/20]
Entry into regional phase21.06.2012National basic fee paid 
21.06.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.06.2012Examination requested  [2013/20]
16.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.09.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2014Fee for grant paid
12.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.05.2013
Opposition(s)07.05.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.12.2011
AL06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
MK06.08.2014
MT06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
SM06.08.2014
TR06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
LU15.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU15.12.2011
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
MK06.08.2014
MT06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
SM06.08.2014
TR06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
LU15.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2016/33]HU15.12.2011
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
MT06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
SM06.08.2014
TR06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
LU15.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2016/32]HU15.12.2011
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
SM06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
LU15.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2016/27]CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
SM06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
LU15.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2016/22]CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
SM06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
LU15.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/50]CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
LU15.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/35]CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
LU15.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/30]CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/23]CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/22]CY06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/10]FI06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
Former [2015/09]FI06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
Former [2015/08]LT06.08.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]DE102006014543  (SUEDZUCKER AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * example 1; claims 1,2,15 *;
 [A]WO2010117344  (SANSET GIDA TURIZM SANAYI VE T [TR], et al) [A] 1-14 * example 2; claims 1-19 *;
 [A]US2008260925  (ZINK GALEN PAUL [US]) [A] 1-14 * claim - *;
 [A]WO2007073187  (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 1, 13 *;
 [A]WO2006094716  (COY JOHANNES [DE]) [A] 1-14 * example 11; claim - *
by applicant   - FREE RADIC DIOL MED., (1997), vol. 22, no. 1-2, pages 257 - 268,
    - DIABETES, (199609), vol. 45, no. 9, pages 1233 - 7,
    - FREE RADIC RES., (200001), vol. 32, no. 1, pages 67 - 74,
    - PHANNACOLOGY, (2010), vol. 85, no. 4, pages 248 - 58,
    - BMC CANCCR, (20100308), vol. 10, page 84,
    - BREAST CANCER RCS TRCAT., (20100216),
    - INT J CANCER., (20100816),
    - DIABETES MCTAB RES REV., (200807), vol. 24, no. 5, pages 371 - 7,