Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2639016

EP2639016 - SPEED-CHANGING SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2017
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.01.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Makita Corporation
3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho
Anjo-shi, Aichi 446-8502 / JP
[2013/38]
Inventor(s)01 / NISHIKIMI Junichi
c/o MAKITA CORPORATION
3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho
Anjo-shi Aichi 446-8502 / JP
 [2013/38]
Representative(s)Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
[2017/06]
Former [2013/38]Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
Application number, filing date11839024.407.09.2011
[2017/06]
WO2011JP70329
Priority number, dateJP2010025255411.11.2010         Original published format: JP 2010252554
[2013/38]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012063543
Date:18.05.2012
Language:JA
[2012/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2639016
Date:18.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2639016
Date:08.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.05.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:B25F5/00, H01H13/00
[2013/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHALTER FÜR GESCHWINDIGKEITSÄNDERUNGEN[2013/38]
English:SPEED-CHANGING SWITCH[2013/38]
French:COMMUTATEUR DE CHANGEMENT DE VITESSE[2013/38]
Entry into regional phase03.05.2013Translation filed 
03.05.2013National basic fee paid 
03.05.2013Search fee paid 
03.05.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
03.05.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/38]
22.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2016Fee for grant paid
21.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.09.2016
Opposition(s)09.11.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.02.2017
CZ08.02.2017
DK08.02.2017
EE08.02.2017
ES08.02.2017
FI08.02.2017
HR08.02.2017
IT08.02.2017
LT08.02.2017
LV08.02.2017
MC08.02.2017
NL08.02.2017
PL08.02.2017
RO08.02.2017
RS08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
SI08.02.2017
SK08.02.2017
SM08.02.2017
BG08.05.2017
NO08.05.2017
GR09.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
IE07.09.2017
LU07.09.2017
MT07.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/39]AT08.02.2017
CZ08.02.2017
DK08.02.2017
EE08.02.2017
ES08.02.2017
FI08.02.2017
HR08.02.2017
IT08.02.2017
LT08.02.2017
LV08.02.2017
MC08.02.2017
NL08.02.2017
PL08.02.2017
RO08.02.2017
RS08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
SI08.02.2017
SK08.02.2017
SM08.02.2017
BG08.05.2017
NO08.05.2017
GR09.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
IE07.09.2017
LU07.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
Former [2018/34]AT08.02.2017
CZ08.02.2017
DK08.02.2017
EE08.02.2017
ES08.02.2017
FI08.02.2017
HR08.02.2017
IT08.02.2017
LT08.02.2017
LV08.02.2017
MC08.02.2017
NL08.02.2017
PL08.02.2017
RO08.02.2017
RS08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
SI08.02.2017
SK08.02.2017
SM08.02.2017
BG08.05.2017
NO08.05.2017
GR09.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
IE07.09.2017
LU07.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
Former [2018/29]AT08.02.2017
CZ08.02.2017
DK08.02.2017
EE08.02.2017
ES08.02.2017
FI08.02.2017
HR08.02.2017
IT08.02.2017
LT08.02.2017
LV08.02.2017
MC08.02.2017
NL08.02.2017
PL08.02.2017
RO08.02.2017
RS08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
SI08.02.2017
SK08.02.2017
SM08.02.2017
BG08.05.2017
NO08.05.2017
GR09.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
Former [2018/14]AT08.02.2017
CZ08.02.2017
DK08.02.2017
EE08.02.2017
ES08.02.2017
FI08.02.2017
HR08.02.2017
IT08.02.2017
LT08.02.2017
LV08.02.2017
NL08.02.2017
PL08.02.2017
RO08.02.2017
RS08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
SI08.02.2017
SK08.02.2017
SM08.02.2017
BG08.05.2017
NO08.05.2017
GR09.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
Former [2017/51]AT08.02.2017
CZ08.02.2017
DK08.02.2017
EE08.02.2017
ES08.02.2017
FI08.02.2017
HR08.02.2017
IT08.02.2017
LT08.02.2017
LV08.02.2017
NL08.02.2017
PL08.02.2017
RO08.02.2017
RS08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
SK08.02.2017
SM08.02.2017
BG08.05.2017
NO08.05.2017
GR09.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
Former [2017/50]AT08.02.2017
CZ08.02.2017
DK08.02.2017
EE08.02.2017
ES08.02.2017
FI08.02.2017
HR08.02.2017
IT08.02.2017
LT08.02.2017
LV08.02.2017
NL08.02.2017
PL08.02.2017
RO08.02.2017
RS08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
SK08.02.2017
BG08.05.2017
NO08.05.2017
GR09.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
Former [2017/49]AT08.02.2017
CZ08.02.2017
EE08.02.2017
ES08.02.2017
FI08.02.2017
HR08.02.2017
IT08.02.2017
LT08.02.2017
LV08.02.2017
NL08.02.2017
RO08.02.2017
RS08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
SK08.02.2017
BG08.05.2017
NO08.05.2017
GR09.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
Former [2017/48]AT08.02.2017
CZ08.02.2017
ES08.02.2017
FI08.02.2017
HR08.02.2017
LT08.02.2017
LV08.02.2017
NL08.02.2017
RS08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
BG08.05.2017
NO08.05.2017
GR09.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
Former [2017/41]AT08.02.2017
ES08.02.2017
FI08.02.2017
HR08.02.2017
LT08.02.2017
LV08.02.2017
NL08.02.2017
RS08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
BG08.05.2017
NO08.05.2017
GR09.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2010206703  (PUZIO DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1-2 * paragraphs [0058] - [0061]; figures 10,11 * [Y] 3-5;
 [Y]JP3812118B  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [Y] 3 * figure 7 *;
 [Y]EP1873801  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [Y] 4 * figures 3-6 *;
 [YA]US5794764  (HIROSE HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * figure 1 * [A] 3;
 [A]US5365155  (ZIMMERMANN BERNWARD [DE]) [A] 2 * figure 3a *
International search[Y]JPH07220563  (OTAX CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH11123669  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT);
 [Y]JP2007236029  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD);
 [Y]JP3812118B  (OMRON CORP.);
 [Y]JPH043374Y  (HITACHI KOKI CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JPS6237222Y  (NIPPON KOGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA);
 [A]JP2003260675  (MAKITA CORP);
 [A]JP2003520696  (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.)
by applicantJP2003260675