Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2639819

EP2639819 - METHOD FOR FORMING THERMAL OXIDE FILM OF MONOCRYSTALLINE SILICON WAFER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 18.07.2018  [2018/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd.
2-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2015/50]
Former [2013/38]For all designated states
Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd.
6-2, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0004 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAKAHASHI, Hiroyuki
c/o Nagano Electronics Industrial Co. Ltd.
1393 Yashiro
Chikuma-shi Nagano 387-8555 / JP
02 / YOSHIDA, Kazuhiko
c/o Nagano Electronics Industrial Co. Ltd.
1393 Yashiro
Chikuma-shi Nagano 387-8555 / JP
 [2013/38]
Representative(s)Wibbelmann, Jobst
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2017/01]
Former [2013/38]Wibbelmann, Jobst
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date11839425.306.10.2011
[2017/01]
WO2011JP05626
Priority number, dateJP2010025177510.11.2010         Original published format: JP 2010251775
[2013/38]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012063402
Date:18.05.2012
Language:JA
[2012/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2639819
Date:18.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2639819
Date:04.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.05.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/316, H01L21/02
[2014/14]
Former International [2013/38]H01L21/316, H01L27/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WÄRMEOXIDFILMS AUS EINEM MONOKRISTALLINEN SILICIUMWAFER[2013/38]
English:METHOD FOR FORMING THERMAL OXIDE FILM OF MONOCRYSTALLINE SILICON WAFER[2013/38]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UN FILM D'OXYDE THERMIQUE DE TRANCHE DE SILICIUM MONOCRISTALLIN[2013/38]
Entry into regional phase06.05.2013Translation filed 
06.05.2013National basic fee paid 
06.05.2013Search fee paid 
06.05.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
06.05.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/38]
19.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.2016Fee for grant paid
22.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.08.2016
Opposition(s)05.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
20.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
20.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
20.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
[2018/29]
Former [2018/14]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/51]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/50]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/49]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/48]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/40]AT04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Documents cited:Search[XIA]US5926741  (MATSUOKA TOSHIMASA [JP], et al) [X] 1-2 * column 10, line 50 - column 13, line 28; figures 2A-2C,6 * [I] 4-7 [A] 3,8;
 [XA]US6797323  (KASHIWAGI AKIHIDE [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 13, line 22 - page 14, line 5; figures 8-11 * [A] 2-8
International search[X]JPH11186255  (SONY CORP);
 [Y]JP2008277702  (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK, et al);
 [A]JP2007053227  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [A]JP2002261094  (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD);
 [A]JP2004064037  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO)
by applicantJP2008277702