Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2640140

EP2640140 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING RELAY LINK RESOURCE ELEMENT GROUP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.08.2013
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2013/38]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / WU, Shuanshuan
c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / BI, Feng
c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / YUAN, Yifei
c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
04 / YUAN, Ming
c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
05 / LIANG, Feng
c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
06 / YANG, Jin
c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2013/38]
Representative(s)CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/09]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2013/38]Smith, Jeremy Robert , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date11840245.203.11.2011
WO2011CN81763
Priority number, dateCN20101053615208.11.2010         Original published format: CN201010536152
[2013/38]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012062178
Date:18.05.2012
Language:ZH
[2012/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2640140
Date:18.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN18.05.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/04, H04L5/00, H04W88/04, // H04L27/26, H04W84/04
[2017/16]
Former International [2013/38]H04W72/04, H04L27/26, H04B7/26
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/38]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON RELAISVERKNÜPFUNGSRESSOURCEN-ELEMENTGRUPPEN[2013/38]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING RELAY LINK RESOURCE ELEMENT GROUP[2013/38]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LA DÉTERMINATION DE GROUPE D'ÉLÉMENTS DE RESSOURCE DE LIEN RELAIS[2013/38]
Entry into regional phase08.05.2013Translation filed 
10.06.2013National basic fee paid 
10.06.2013Search fee paid 
10.06.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
10.06.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/38]
17.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
19.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
04.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]  - LG-NORTEL, "R-PDCCH Multiplexing for LTE-A relay node", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-103145 R-PDCCH MULTIPLEXING FOR LTE-A RELAY NODE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100504), vol. RAN WG1, no. Montreal, Canada; 20100510, XP050420213 [X] 1,9 * figure 1 * * sections 1, 2, 3.1 *
 [X]  - PANASONIC, "R-PDCCH placement", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-102881, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100504), vol. RAN WG1, no. Montreal, Canada; 20100510, XP050420028 [X] 1,9 * figure 3; table 1 * * sections 2.1-2.3 *
 [X]  - NOKIA ET AL, "DM RS Pattern for Backhaul", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-103820 DM RS PATTERN FOR BACKHAUL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100622), vol. RAN WG1, no. Dresden, Germany; 20100628, XP050449241 [X] 1,9 * figure 1 * * pages 1 and 3 *
 [I]  - CATT, "Design of Interleaving R-PDCCH in Rel-10", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-105178, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20101005), vol. RAN WG1, no. Xi'an; 20101011, XP050450396 [I] 1-3,5,9-11,13 * table 1 * * sections 1, 2, 2.1-2.3 *
 [I]  - NEC GROUP, "Remaining issues of the R-PDCCH interleaving for Type 1 Relay nodes", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-105420 REMAINING ISSUES OF R-PDCCH INTERLEAVING FOR TYPE 1 RELAY NODES-FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20101005), vol. RAN WG1, no. Xi'an; 20101011, XP050450557 [I] 1-3,5,9-11,13 * sections 1, 2.2 *
International search[X]CN101841363  (ZTE CORP [CN]);
 [A]WO2010053145  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP], et al);
 [A]CN101605023  (ZTE CORP [CN]);
 [A]CN101527916  (ZTE CORP)