Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2639706

EP2639706 - RELATED-WORD REGISTRATION DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, RELATED-WORD REGISTRATION METHOD, PROGRAM FOR RELATED-WORD REGISTRATION DEVICE, RECORDING MEDIUM, AND RELATED-WORD REGISTRATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.01.2016
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rakuten, Inc.
1-14-1, Tamagawa
Setagaya-ku
Tokyo 158-0094 / JP
[2015/44]
Former [2013/38]For all designated states
Rakuten, Inc.
4-12-3, Higashishinagawa Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-0002 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HIRATE Yu
c/o Rakuten Inc.
4-12-3 Higashishinagawa
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-0002 / JP
 [2013/38]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/38]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date11840363.307.11.2011
WO2011JP75574
Priority number, dateJP2010025232710.11.2010         Original published format: JP 2010252327
[2013/38]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012063772
Date:18.05.2012
Language:JA
[2012/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2639706
Date:18.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.05.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2013/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/38]
TitleGerman:REGISTRIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR VERWANDTE WORTE, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, REGISTRIERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR VERWANDTE WORTE, PROGRAMM FÜR EINE REGISTRIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR VERWANDTE WORTE, AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM UND REGISTRIERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR VERWANDTE WORTE[2013/38]
English:RELATED-WORD REGISTRATION DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, RELATED-WORD REGISTRATION METHOD, PROGRAM FOR RELATED-WORD REGISTRATION DEVICE, RECORDING MEDIUM, AND RELATED-WORD REGISTRATION SYSTEM[2013/38]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT DE MOTS LIÉS, DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ D'ENREGISTREMENT DE MOTS LIÉS, PROGRAMME DESTINÉ À UN DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT DE MOTS LIÉS, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT ET SYSTÈME D'ENREGISTREMENT DE MOTS LIÉS[2013/38]
Entry into regional phase24.05.2013Translation filed 
24.05.2013National basic fee paid 
24.05.2013Search fee paid 
24.05.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
24.05.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/38]
23.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
02.01.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
03.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination03.03.2017Appeal received No.  T1405/17
27.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.06.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
18.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
23.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
26.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
22.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[I]EP2051174  (XEROX CORP [US]) [I] 1-17 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0040] *;
 [I]US2010228710  (IMIG SCOTT K [US] ET AL) [I] 1-17 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0025] *;
 [I]US2009024613  (NIU CHENG [CN] ET AL) [I] 1-17 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0034] *;
 [A]US2010094854  (ROUHANI-KALLEH OMID [US]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0028] *
International search[Y]JP2006085389  (UNIV KYOTO)
 [Y]  - MASAKATSU OKUBO ET AL., "Extracting Information Demand by Analyzing a WWW Search Log", TRANSACTIONS OF INFORMATION PROCESSING SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (19980715), vol. 39, no. 7, pages 2250 - 2258, XP008171097
 [Y]  - TAKANORI UGAI, "Using the Knowledge from Search Engine Log", IPSJ SIG NOTES, (20001019), vol. 2000, no. 97, pages 61 - 66, XP008171007
by applicantJP2001290840