Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2646409

EP2646409 - FINGOLIMOD POLYMORPHS AND THEIR PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.08.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.06.2018  [2018/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shilpa Medicare Limited
2nd Floor, 10/80 Rajendra Gunj
Raichur
Raichur 584102, Karnataka / IN
[2013/41]
Inventor(s)01 / SHRAWAT, Vimal Kumar
Shilpa Medicare Limited
2nd Floor
10/80
Rajendra Gunj, Raichur, Karnataka
Raichur 584 102 / IN
02 / ".", Veereshappa
Shilpa Medicare Limited
2nd Floor
10/80
Rajendra Gunj, Raichur, Karnataka
Raichur 584 102 / IN
03 / PUROHIT, Prashant
Shilpa Medicare Limited
2nd Floor
10/80
Rajendra Gunj, Raichur, Karnataka
Raichur 584 102 / IN
04 / SINGH, Vinod Kumar
Shilpa Medicare Limited
2nd Floor
10/80
Rajendra Gunj, Raichur, Karnataka
Raichur 584 102 / IN
 [2013/41]
Representative(s)Lecca, Patricia S. , et al
Cabinet Lecca
21, rue de Fécamp
75012 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/41]Iskender, Ibrahim
Destek Patent, Inc.
Lefkose Cad. NM Ofis Park
B Block No: 36/5 Besevler
16110 Bursa / TR
Application number, filing date11842990.129.08.2011
WO2011IN00586
Priority number, dateIN2010CHE356325.11.2010         Original published format: IN 3563CH2010
[2017/16]
Former [2013/41]IN2010CHE356325.11.2010
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012070059
Date:31.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2646409
Date:09.10.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2012
[2013/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN31.05.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:C07C215/28, C07C213/00, A61K31/137, A61P37/02
[2013/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/41]
TitleGerman:FINGOLIMOD-POLYMORPHE UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR[2013/41]
English:FINGOLIMOD POLYMORPHS AND THEIR PROCESSES[2013/41]
French:POLYMORPHES DU FINGOLIMODE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS[2013/41]
Entry into regional phase31.01.2013National basic fee paid 
31.01.2013Search fee paid 
31.01.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/41]
01.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2017Observations by third parties
13.06.2017Observations by third parties
16.06.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.06.2017
23.06.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
07.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/25]
29.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/25]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.07.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201707   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XDI]WO2010055028  (NOVARTIS AG [CH]; MUTZ MICHAEL [CH]; JORDINE GUIDO [CH]) [XD] 7-10 * the whole document * [I] 1-6,11-15
International search[X]US5604229  (FUJITA TETSURO [JP], et al);
 [X]CN1266844  (CHINA AMERICA JOINT HUADONG PH [CN]);
 [X]CN1483721  (QI YOUMAO [CN]);
 [X]CN1528738  (MA QIMING [CN]);
 [X]CN1765872  (JIANGSU WUZHONG PHARMACEUTICAL [CN]);
 [X]CN1814583  (XUZHOU NORMAL UNIV [CN]);
 [X]JPH11310556  (YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUTICAL);
 [XP]CN102120720  (GROWINGCHEM CO LTD)
 [X]  - SUGIYAMA, SHIGEO ET AL., "A convenient synthesis of immunosuppressive agent FTY720 using the petasis reaction", CHEMICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, (200501), vol. 53, no. 1, pages 100 - 102, XP008167237

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/http://dx.doi.org/10.1248/cpb.53.100
 [X]  - KIUCHI, MASATOSHI ET AL., "Synthesis and immunosuppressive activity of 2-substituted 2-aminopropane-1,3-diols and 2-aminoethanols", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20000711), vol. 43, no. 15, pages 2946 - 2961, XP002319479

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm000173z
 [X]  - WANG, MI JUAN ET AL., "Synthesis of fingolimode", CHINESE JOURNAL OF NEW DRUGS, (2006), vol. 15, no. 10, pages 802 - 804, XP008128520
 [X]  - CHEN, YAO ET AL., "Synthesis of a new immunosuppressant 2-amino-2-(2-(4-octylphenyl) ethyl)-1,3-propanediol hydrochloride (FTY 720)", CHINESE JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (200908), vol. 19, no. 4, pages 257 - 260, XP008128518
 [X]  - LIANG, TIE ET AL., "Synthesis of a new immunosuppressant FTY-720", JOURNAL OF JILIN UNIVERSITY (SCIENCE EDITION), (200801), vol. 46, no. 1, pages 139 - 142, XP008128500
 [XP]  - ANONYMOUSLY, "Solid state forms of 2-amino-2-[2-(4-octylphenyl)ethyl]-1,3-propanediol hydrochloride compositions", IP.COM, Database accession no. IPCOM000204549D, XP013144177
    [ ] - IP.COM JOURNAL, (20110303), pages 1 - 21
by applicantUS5604229