blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2649086 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2649086



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1139
14.06.2012 Sequence listing Search / examination 18
14.06.2012 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 128
14.06.2012 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
04.07.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 91
04.07.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 129
23.08.2012 Statement under Art. 19 PCT Search / examination 1
23.08.2012 Republication of A1/A2 Pamphlet -amended claims and/or statement Search / examination 1
23.08.2012 Claims filed under Art.19 PCT Search / examination 11
19.04.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
27.06.2013 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
09.07.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
09.07.2013 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 18
09.07.2013 Annex Search / examination 1
09.07.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
09.07.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
09.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
05.08.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.08.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.08.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.08.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.08.2013 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
19.08.2013 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
21.08.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.09.2013 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
18.09.2013 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.11.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
22.01.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
13.11.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
02.12.2014 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 4
02.12.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
02.12.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.12.2014 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
24.02.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.06.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 10
29.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
29.06.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
11.08.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
17.08.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.08.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
21.12.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 15
21.12.2015 Non-scannable object Search / examination 6
21.12.2015 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
21.12.2015 Non-scannable object Search / examination 4
21.12.2015 Non-scannable object Search / examination 20
21.12.2015 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
21.12.2015 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
21.12.2015 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
21.12.2015 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
21.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
21.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
21.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
21.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
21.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
21.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
21.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
21.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
21.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 20
21.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 4
21.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
02.02.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
22.02.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
24.02.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
24.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.05.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
19.05.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.05.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
19.05.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
19.05.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
25.05.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
31.05.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
14.10.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 13
14.10.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
14.10.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
14.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.10.2016 Description Search / examination 35
14.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
14.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
14.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
14.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
14.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
14.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
14.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
14.10.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 33
14.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
14.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
14.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
14.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
14.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
14.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
14.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
14.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.11.2016 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
10.11.2016 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
10.11.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
21.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
02.12.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
02.12.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
02.12.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
02.12.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
02.12.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
02.12.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 9
02.12.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 17
02.12.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 10
02.12.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 17
15.12.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.12.2016 Description Search / examination 14
15.12.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
15.12.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 14
15.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
15.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.02.2017 Text intended for grant (sequence listing) Search / examination 18
14.02.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 124
14.02.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 124
14.02.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 3
14.02.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.02.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
06.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
06.06.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
06.06.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
06.06.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.06.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.07.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
24.05.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1