blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2649086


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
16.06.2017 (Expected) grant published on  19.07.2017  [2017/29]
09.06.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
09.06.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
07.06.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
13.02.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
03.02.2017 Change - divisional application(s) published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
23.12.2016 Change - classification published on  25.01.2017  [2017/04]
23.12.2016 Change - classification published on  25.01.2017  [2017/04]
23.12.2016 Change - French title published on  25.01.2017  [2017/04]
16.12.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.11.2016 Change - divisional application(s) published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
18.05.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
17.02.2016 Change - representative
04.01.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.08.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.08.2015 First examination report
02.07.2015 Amendment by applicant
16.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.12.2014 Supplementary search report published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]
28.11.2014 Change - classification published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]
28.11.2014 Change - classification published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]
21.11.2014 Change - classification published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
21.11.2014 Change - classification published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
03.12.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.09.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.10.2013  [2013/42]
13.09.2013 Request for examination filed published on  16.10.2013  [2013/42]
21.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
16.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
30.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
30.07.2013 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
09.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
09.07.2013 Amendment by applicant
26.06.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
15.06.2012 PCT data prior to European publication