blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2649086 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201180067173 CN201610621041 CN201710853190 CN201711345686 EP11846757 EP17153799 EP17191702



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018258391Global Dossier 13.09.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201313992622 09.07.2013
US201715696584 06.09.2017
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US201615353899 17.11.2016
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2017283775Global Dossier 05.10.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201313992622 09.07.2013
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US201615353899 17.11.2016
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9540445Global Dossier 10.01.2017B2
US2016208012 21.07.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201313992622 09.07.2013
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US201614997136 15.01.2016
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9518123Global Dossier 13.12.2016B2
US2016194404 07.07.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201313992622 09.07.2013
US201614997042 15.01.2016
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9499629Global Dossier 22.11.2016B2
US2013287748 31.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201113992622 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9481728Global Dossier 01.11.2016B2
US2016159907 09.06.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201313992622 09.07.2013
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
US201514984371 30.12.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9464140Global Dossier 11.10.2016B2
US2016130355 12.05.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201313992622 09.07.2013
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201614996953 15.01.2016
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9328156Global Dossier 03.05.2016B2
US2014106449 17.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313992622 09.07.2013
US201314107302 16.12.2013
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9102761Global Dossier 11.08.2015B2
US2015099299 09.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201414568569 12.12.2014
US201313992622 09.07.2013
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9102760Global Dossier 11.08.2015B2
US2015093822 02.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201414567426 11.12.2014
US201313992622 09.07.2013
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9101584Global Dossier 11.08.2015B2
US2015118202 30.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201313992622 09.07.2013
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US201414568195 12.12.2014
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8975071Global Dossier 10.03.2015B1
US2015050729 19.02.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201313992622 09.07.2013
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US201414465952 22.08.2014
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8916381Global Dossier 23.12.2014B1
US2014370017 18.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313992622 09.07.2013
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201414466096 22.08.2014
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8911993Global Dossier 16.12.2014B2
US2013288368 31.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201313992622 09.07.2013
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201313938923 10.07.2013
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8906682Global Dossier 09.12.2014B2
US2013309258 21.11.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201313992622 09.07.2013
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201313938947 10.07.2013
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20130124521Global Dossier 14.11.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5947311BGlobal Dossier 06.07.2016B2
JP2014507118 27.03.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3305798Global Dossier 11.04.2018A1
Priority number Date
EP11846757 09.12.2011
EP17153799 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3214091Global Dossier 03.10.2018B1
EP3214091 06.09.2017A1
Priority number Date
EP11846757 09.12.2011
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108103085Global Dossier 01.06.2018A
Priority number Date
CN201180067173 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107699585Global Dossier 16.02.2018A
Priority number Date
CN201180067173 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN106220739Global Dossier 14.12.2016A
Priority number Date
CN201180067173 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103492406Global Dossier 01.01.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2820681Global Dossier 23.10.2018C
CA2820681 14.06.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2649086Global Dossier 19.07.2017B1
EP2649086 31.12.2014A4
EP2649086 16.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2011338200B 23.02.2017B2
AU2011338200 04.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2017203087B 20.06.2019B2
AU2017203087 08.06.2017A1
Priority number Date
AU2017203087 09.05.2017
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
AU2011338200 09.12.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2017225161 09.11.2017A1
Priority number Date
AU2017203087 09.05.2017
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
AU2017225161 10.09.2017
US201161502649 29.06.2011
AU2011338200 09.12.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112013014265 17.04.2018A8
BR112013014265 19.12.2017A2
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CL2013001645 14.02.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CR20130269 03.09.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CU20130079 27.09.2013A7
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1119760T 27.06.2018T1
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2649086T 18.09.2017T3
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK3214091T 07.01.2019T3
Priority number Date
EP11846757 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EA027153 30.06.2017B1
EA201390847 30.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ECSP13012739 31.10.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2641870T 14.11.2017T3
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20171577T 01.12.2017T1
Priority number Date
EP11846757 09.12.2011
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20182202T 08.03.2019T1
Priority number Date
EP17153799 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HUS1900006I 29.04.2019I1
Priority number Date
EP17153799 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HUS1900007I 29.04.2019I1
Priority number Date
EP11846757 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
LT2649086T 10.11.2017T
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
LTPA2019502I 12.03.2019I1
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
LTPA2019503I 12.03.2019I1
Priority number Date
EP11846757 09.12.2011
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MA34813 02.01.2014B1
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX347078 10.04.2017B
MX2013006570 26.08.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO2019006I 15.02.2019I1
Priority number Date
EP11846757 09.12.2011
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO2019007I 15.02.2019I1
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ612512 27.03.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL2649086T 30.03.2018T3
Priority number Date
EP11846757 09.12.2011
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL3214091T 29.03.2019T3
Priority number Date
EP11846757 09.12.2011
EP17153799 09.12.2011
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RS56453 31.01.2018B1
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RS58100 28.02.2019B1
Priority number Date
EP17153799 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SG190997 31.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI2649086T 31.01.2018T1
Priority number Date
EP11846757 09.12.2011
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI3214091T 28.02.2019T1
Priority number Date
EP17153799 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TN2013000246 10.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ZA201304470 27.08.2014B
Priority number Date
WO2011US64191 09.12.2011
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2012079000Global Dossier 23.08.2012A4
WO2012079000 14.06.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2018029595Global Dossier 01.03.2018A
Priority number Date
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2018029594Global Dossier 01.03.2018A
Priority number Date
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6293194BGlobal Dossier 14.03.2018B2
JP2016174607 06.10.2016A
Priority number Date
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CO6801633 29.11.2013A2
Priority number Date
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DOP2013000128 16.03.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EA201790175 29.09.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2700966T 20.02.2019T3
Priority number Date
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GT201300150 10.06.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HUE036872T 28.08.2018T2
Priority number Date
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HUE042207T 28.06.2019T2
Priority number Date
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
LT3214091T 10.12.2018T
Priority number Date
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PE01782014 20.02.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT2649086T 19.10.2017T
Priority number Date
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SG10201510092Q 28.01.2016A
Priority number Date
US201161502649 29.06.2011
US42147010 09.12.2010
TypeType Divisional application
  Application withdrawn  : 16.02.2017
 EP3214091
 EP3305798