blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2649086

Designated contracting statesAL 
 AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IS 
 IT 
 LI 
 LT 
 LU 
LV 
 MCLapse: 19.07.2017
 MK 
 MT 
 NL 
 NO 
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 RS 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 SMLapse: 19.07.2017
 TR 
Examination procedure06.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase09.07.2013National basic fee paid 
09.07.2013Search fee paid 
09.07.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2013Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted19.07.2017
Opposition procedure20.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit published on 27.06.2018 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:16.10.2013 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:BA ME
 
Event date:16.10.2013 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:16.10.2013 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20130709
 
Event date:07.02.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK DE 1185083 HK
Code Expl.: REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:24.12.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C07H 21/04 20060101AFI20141119BHEP
 
Event date:24.12.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 39/00 20060101ALI20141119BHEP
 
Event date:31.12.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 39/00 20060101ALI20141125BHEP
 
Event date:31.12.2014 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20141202
 
Event date:31.12.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C07H 21/04 20060101AFI20141125BHEP
 
Event date:16.09.2015 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20150817
 
Event date:20.12.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R079 602011039815 DE
Code Expl.: AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS
Free Format Text:PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: C07H0021040000
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K0039000000
 
Event date:25.01.2017 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 35/17 20150101ALI20161220BHEP
 
Event date:25.01.2017 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 39/00 20060101AFI20161220BHEP
 
Event date:15.03.2017 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20170214
 
Event date:19.07.2017 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:BA ME
 
Event date:19.07.2017 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:19.07.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:09.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:15.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 909750 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20170815
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602011039815 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:18.09.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
Effective DATE:20170911
 
Event date:03.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG RO EPE
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA
 
Event date:04.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL FP
Code Expl.: TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)
 
Event date:10.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:13.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI, CH
 
Event date:19.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A 2649086 PT 20171019 T
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20171009
 
Event date:14.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2641870 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20171114
 
Event date:11.12.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:7
 
Event date:15.12.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE FG4A E014392 EE
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA
Effective DATE:20171003
 
Event date:27.12.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NO T2
Code Expl.:+ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY
Effective DATE:20170719
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20171204
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:05.02.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK T3 E 25538 SK
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAKIAN
 
Event date:04.04.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20170402770 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
Effective DATE:20180330
 
Event date:20.04.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK GR 1185083 HK
Code Expl.:+STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:20.04.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602011039815 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:31.05.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SM
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170719
 
Event date:27.06.2018 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20180420
 
Event date:28.08.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AG4A E036872 HU
Code Expl.:+FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Event date:28.09.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MT
Payment DATE:20171218
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:31.12.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20181126
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20181128
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NO
Payment DATE:20181211
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Payment DATE:20181206
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20181213
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Payment DATE:20181129
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Payment DATE:20181207
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20181211
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Payment DATE:20181210
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20181210
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20181211
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20181130
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Payment DATE:20181126
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20181212
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20181128
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20181210
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Payment DATE:20181129
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20181126
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20181127
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:15.02.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FI SPCF
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE APPLICATION FILED
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C20190006
 
Event date:15.02.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CP
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TISAGENLECLEUCEL; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/18/1297 20180827
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:19C1006
Filing DATE:20190215
 
Event date:20.02.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL SPCF
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TISAGENLECLEUCEL; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/18/1297 20180827
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:300967
Filing DATE:20190215
Expiry DATE:20311208
Extension DATE:20330826
 
Event date:26.02.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R065 602011039815 DE
Code Expl.:+REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE VALIDLY FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TISAGENLECLEUCEL; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/18/1297 20180823
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:122019000006
Filing DATE:20190215
Expiry DATE:20311210
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:E. BLUM AND CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE , CH
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Payment DATE:20181203
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AL
Payment DATE:20181221
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HR
Payment DATE:20181127
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20181127
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Payment DATE:20181130
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20181205
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20181217
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20181126
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RS
Payment DATE:20181205
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Payment DATE:20181130
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:04.03.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NO SPCF
Code Expl.: FILING OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TISAGENLEKLEUCEL; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/18/1297 20180823
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:2019007
Filing DATE:20190215
 
Event date:11.03.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LU SPCF
Code Expl.:+SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: KYMRIAH - TISAGENLECLEUCEL; AUTHORISATION NUMBER AND DATE: EU/1/18/1297 20180827
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:LUC00104
Filing DATE:20190215
Expiry DATE:20311209
Extension DATE:20330827
 
Event date:12.03.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE SPCF
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TISAGENLECLEUCEL; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/18/1297 20180827
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:1990008-3
 
Event date:12.03.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT SPCF
Code Expl.: FILING AN SPC
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TISAGENLEKLEUCELAS; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/18/1297 20180823
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:PA2019502
Filing DATE:20190215
Expiry DATE:20311209
 
Event date:13.03.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB CTFF
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TISAGENLECLEUCEL; REGISTERED: UK EU/1/18/1297 20180823
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:SPC/GB19/011
Filing DATE:20190215
 
Event date:15.03.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE AA1Y E014392 EE
Code Expl.:+SPC FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TISAGEENLEKLEUTSEEL;REG NO/DATE: EU/1/18/1297 27.08.2018
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C20190004
Filing DATE:20190215
 
Event date:20.03.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE SPCF
Code Expl.: REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TISAGENLECLEUCEL; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/18/1297 20180823
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:2019/007
Filing DATE:20190215
 
Event date:25.03.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK CTFF
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TISAGENLECLEUCEL; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/18/1297 20180827
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:CA 2019 00006
Filing DATE:20190215
Expiry DATE:20311209
Extension DATE:20330827
 
Event date:25.03.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE SPCF
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TISAGENLECLEUCEL; AUTHORISATION NUMBER AND DATE: EU/1/18/1297 20180827
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:2019C/504
Filing DATE:20190215
Expiry DATE:20311209
Extension DATE:20330827
 
Event date:02.04.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK SPCF
Code Expl.:+FILING AN SPC
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TISAGENLEKLEUCEL; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/18/1297 20180827
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:4-2019
Filing DATE:20190215
 
Event date:15.04.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT SPCF 909750 AT T
Code Expl.:+FILING AN SPC
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TISAGENLECLEUCEL; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/18/1297 (MITTEILUNG) 20180827
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:4/2019
Filing DATE:20190215
Effective DATE:20190415
 
Event date:15.04.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH SPCF
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TISAGENLECLEUCEL; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: SWISSMEDIC-ZULASSUNG 66778 18.10.2018
Filing DATE:20190411
 
Event date:29.04.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AA1S E036872
Code Expl.:+INFORMATION ON APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:S1900007
Filing DATE:20190215
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20190102
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20181220
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Payment DATE:20181203
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MK
Payment DATE:20181127
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:13.06.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES SPCF
Code Expl.: REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TISAGENLECLEUCEL; NATIONAL AUTHORISATION NUMBER: EU/1/18/1297; DATE OF AUTHORISATION: 20180823; NUMBER OF FIRST AUTHORISATION IN EUROPEAN ECONOMIC AREA (EEA): EU/1/18/1297; DATE OF FIRST AUTHORISATION IN EEA: 20180823
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C201930005
Effective DATE:20190215
 
Event date:28.06.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170719