Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2649086

EP2649086 - USE OF CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTOR-MODIFIED T CELLS TO TREAT CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Database last updated on 21.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.02.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania
Center for Technology Transfer
3160 Chestnut Street, Suite 200
Philadelphia PA 19104-6283 / US
[2017/29]
Former [2013/42]For all designated states
The Trustees Of The University Of Pennsylvania
Center for Technology Transfer 3160 Chestnut Street Suite 200
Philadelphia, PA 19104-6283 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JUNE, Carl, H.
409 Baird Road
Merion Station, PA 19066 / US
02 / LEVINE, Bruce, L.
1258 Liberty Bell Drive
Cherry Hill, NJ 08003 / US
03 / PORTER, David, L.
821 Crum Creek Road
Springfield, PA 19064 / US
04 / KALOS, Michael, D.
716 Carpenter Lane
Philadelphia, PA 19119 / US
05 / MILONE, Michael C.
314 Surrey Road
Cherry Hill, NJ 08002 / US
 [2013/42]
Representative(s)Bassil, Nicholas Charles
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/29]Bassil, Nicholas Charles
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2013/42]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date11846757.009.12.2011
[2017/29]
WO2011US64191
Priority number, dateUS201161502649P29.06.2011         Original published format: US 201161502649 P
US20100421470P09.12.2010         Original published format: US 421470 P
[2013/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012079000
Date:14.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2649086
Date:16.10.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2012
[2013/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2649086
Date:19.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.06.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/00, A61K35/17
[2017/04]
Former International [2013/42]C07H21/04, A61K39/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/42]
Extension statesBA09.07.2013
ME09.07.2013
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON DURCH EINEN CHIMÄREN ANTIGENREZEPTOR MODIFIZIERTEN T-ZELLEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS[2013/42]
English:USE OF CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTOR-MODIFIED T CELLS TO TREAT CANCER[2013/42]
French:UTILISATION DE LYMPHOCYTES T MODIFIÉS PAR UN RÉCEPTEUR D'ANTIGÈNES CHIMÉRIQUE POUR TRAITER LE CANCER[2017/04]
Former [2013/42]UTILISATION DE LYMPHOCYTES T MODIFIÉS PAR UN RÉCEPTEUR CHIMÉRIQUE D'ANTIGÈNES CHIMÉRIQUE POUR TRAITER LE CANCER
Entry into regional phase09.07.2013National basic fee paid 
09.07.2013Search fee paid 
09.07.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/42]
29.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
02.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
02.12.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
15.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2017Fee for grant paid
06.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16199372.0   Application withdrawn  : 16.02.2017
EP17153799.6  / EP3214091
EP17191702.4  / EP3305798
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.08.2015
Opposition(s)20.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
[2019/30]
Former [2018/27]SM19.07.2017
Documents cited:Search[I]US2004043401  (SADELAIN MICHEL [US], et al) [I] 1-38 * the whole document *;
 [I]WO2009091826  (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al) [I] 1-38 * page 2, paragraph 0007 - page 4, paragraph 0015 * * page 8, paragraph 0034 - page 14, paragraph 0051 * * page 17, paragraph 0059; example - *;
 [I]  - TAMMANA SYAM ET AL, "4-1BB and CD28 Signaling Plays a Synergistic Role in Redirecting Umbilical Cord Blood T Cells Against B-Cell Malignancies", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (201001), vol. 21, pages 75 - 86, XP002732432 [I] 1-38 * abstract * * page 75, column r, paragraph 2 - page 76, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 77, column r, paragraph 3 - page 78, column l, paragraph 1; figure 1 * * page 81, column r, paragraph 1 - page 84, column r, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/HUM.2009.122
 [ID]  - MILONE MICHAEL C ET AL, "Chimeric receptors containing CD137 signal transduction domains mediate enhanced survival of T cells and increased antileukemic efficacy in vivo.", MOLECULAR THERAPY : THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF GENE THERAPY AUG 2009, (200908), vol. 17, no. 8, ISSN 1525-0024, pages 1453 - 1464, XP002732433 [ID] 1-38 * abstract * * page 1454, column l, paragraph 1 - column r, paragraph 1 * * page 1455, column r, paragraph l - page 1461, column l, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/MT.2009.83
 [I]  - CARPENITO CARMINE ET AL, "Control of large, established tumor xenografts with genetically retargeted human T cells containing CD28 and CD137 domains", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (200903), vol. 106, no. 9, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3360 - 3365, XP002732434 [I] 1-38 * abstract * * page 3360, column r, paragraph 2 - page 3361, column r, paragraph 2 * * page 3362, column l, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 3363, column r, paragraph 2 - page 3364, column r2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0813101106
 [IP]  - DAVID L. PORTER ET AL., "Chimeric antigen receptor-modified T cells in chronic lymphoid leukemia", THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (20110825), vol. 365, no. 8, pages 725 - 733, XP002732435 [IP] 1-38 * abstract * * page 726, column r, paragraph 1; figure 1 * * page 730, column l, paragraph 2 - page 733, column l, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1103849
International search[A]WO2010025177  (HOPE CITY [US], et al);
 [A]US2004043401  (SADELAIN MICHEL [US], et al);
 [A]US2009297994  (BORDERS HARLEY ALLEN [US], et al);
 [A]US7319143  (GROSS GIDEON [IL], et al);
 [A]US7265209  (JENSEN MICHAEL [US]);
 [A]US7448191  (ELHARDT PAUL M [US], et al);
 [A]US7446190  (SADELAIN MICHEL [US], et al);
 [A]US6410319  (RAUBITSCHEK ANDREW [US], et al);
 [A]US7514537  (JENSEN MICHAEL [US]);
 [A]WO2010085660  (ROGER WILLIAMS HOSPITAL [US], et al);
 [A]  - MILONA ET AL., "Chimeric receptors containing CD137 signal transduction domain mediate enhanced survival of T ceils and increased antileukemic efficacy in vivo.", MOL THER, (2009), vol. 17, no. 8, pages 1453 - 1464, XP055052474

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2009.83
 [A]  - IMAI ET AL., "Chimeric receptors with 4-188 signaling capacity provoke potent cytotoxicity against acute lymphoblastic leukemia.", LEUKEMIA, (2004), vol. 18, no. 4, pages 676 - 684, XP002579934
 [A]  - SEBESTYEN ET AL., "Human TCR that incorporate CD3zeta induce highly preferred patring between TCRalpha and beta chains following gene transfer.", J IMMUNOL., (2008), vol. 180, no. 11, pages 7735 - 7746, XP055118197

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.180.11.7736
 [A]  - "T-cell surface glycoprotein CD3 zeta chain isoform 2 precursor [Homo sapiens].", PROTEIN, (20101121), Database accession no. NP_000725., XP003030111
 [A]  - "T-cell surface glycoprotein CD3 zeta chain isoform 1 precursor [Homo sapiens].", PROTEIN, (20101121), Database accession no. NP_932170.1., XP003030115
 [A]  - CALL ET AL., "The T cell receptor: critical role of the membrane environment in receptor assembly and function.", ANNU REV LMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 23, pages 101 - 125, XP002396081

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.immunol.23.021704.115625
 [AP]  - KALOS ET AL., "T cells with chimeric antigen receptors have potent antitumor effects and can establish memory in patients with advanced leukemia. 95ra73", SCI TRANSL MED., (20110810), vol. 3, no. 95, pages 1 - 12, XP002667262

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/scitranslmed.3002842
 [AP]  - PORTER ET AL., "Chimeric Antigen Receptor Therapy for B-cell Malignancies.", J CANCER., (20110601), vol. 2, pages 331 - 332, XP055118200

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.7150/jca.2.331
 [AP]  - PORTER ET AL., "Chimeric antigen receptor-modified T cells in chronic lymphoid leukemia.", N ENGL J MED., (20110825), vol. 365, no. 8, pages 725 - 733, XP055052475

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1103849
Examination   - Supplementary Materials to D2
    - SHANKS NIALL ET AL, "Are animal models predictive for humans?", PHILOSOPHY, ETHICS, AND HUMANITIES IN MEDICINE, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LO, (20090115), vol. 4, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1747-5341-4-2, ISSN 1747-5341, page 2, XP021052033

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1747-5341-4-2
    - SEOK JUNHEE ET AL, "Genomic responses in mouse models poorly mimic human inflammatory diseases", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (201302), vol. 110, no. 9, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3507 - 3512
    - MAK ISABELLA W Y ET AL, "Lost in translation: animal models and clinical trials in cancer treatment", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF TRANSLATIONAL RESEARCH, (2014), vol. 6, no. 2, ISSN 1943-8141(print), pages 114 - 118
    - ERWIN M. LEE ET AL., "Xenograft models for the preclinical valuation of new therapies in acute leukemia", LEUKEMIA & LYMPHOMA, (200704), vol. 48, no. 4, pages 659 - 668
by applicantUS2004043401
 US5399346
 US5580859
 US5589466
 WO0196584
 WO0129058
 US6326193
 US6352694
 US6534055
 US6905680
 US6692964
 US5858358
 US6887466
 US6905681
 US7144575
 US7067318
 US7172869
 US7232566
 US7175843
 US5883223
 US6905874
 US6797514
 US6867041
 US2006121005
 US2004101519
 US2006034810
 US5199942
 US6120766
    - BRENTJENS ET AL., MOLECULAR THERAPY, (2010), vol. 18, no. 4, pages 666 - 668
    - MORGAN ET AL., MOLECULAR THERAPY, (20100223), pages 1 - 9
    - TILL ET AL., BLOOD, (2008), vol. 112, pages 2261 - 2271
    - UCKUN ET AL., BLOOD, (1988), vol. 71, pages 13 - 29
    - JENA ET AL., BLOOD, (2010), vol. 116, pages 1035 - 1044
    - MILONE ET AL., MOLECULAR THERAPY, (2009), vol. 17, no. 8, pages 1453 - 1464
    - GHOSH ET AL., GLYCOBIOLOGY, (1991), vol. 5, pages 505 - 10
    - LIU ET AL., CELL, (1991), vol. 66, pages 807 - 815
    - HENDERSON ET AL., IMMUN., (1991), vol. 73, pages 316 - 321
    - BIERER ET AL., CURR. OPIN. IMMUN., (1993), vol. 5, pages 763 - 773
    - BERG ET AL., TRANSPLANT PROC., (1998), vol. 30, no. 8, pages 3975 - 3977
    - HAANEN ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1999), vol. 190, no. 9, page 13191328
    - GARLAND ET AL., J. IMMUNOL METH., (1999), vol. 227, no. 1-2, pages 53 - 63
    - ROSENBERG ET AL., NEW ENG. J. OF MED., (1988), vol. 319, page 1676