Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2649697

EP2649697 - POWER SUPPLIES FOR POOL AND SPA EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change - divisional application(s)published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hayward Industries, Inc.
620 Division Street
Elizabeth NJ 07201 / US
[2019/33]
Former [2013/42]For all designated states
Hayward Industries, Inc.
620 Division Street
Elizabeth NJ 07201 / US
Inventor(s)01 / POTUCEK, Kevin L.
18 Spring Lake Drive
Far Hills, NJ 07931 / US
02 / WILLIS, Dennis
6410 Peppermill Drive
Oak Ridge, NC 27310 / US
03 / SUMONTHEE, Jeffrey
3218 Turtle Cove
West Palm Beach, FL 33411 / US
04 / RENAUD, Benoit J.
351 Grant Street
Fort Atkinson Wisconsin 53538 / US
05 / PHILHOWER, Douglas H.
205 North Forke Drive
Advance, NC 27006 / US
06 / FORSYTHE, Patrick J.
149 Arbor Hill Avenue
Mocksville, NC 27028 / US
07 / NORMYLE, William M.
2002 Tory Drive
Yadkinville, NC 27055-8647 / US
 [2016/48]
Former [2013/42]01 / POTUCEK, Kevin L.
18 Spring Lake Drive
Far Hills, NJ 07931 / US
02 / WILLIS, Dennis
6410 Peppermill Drive
Oak Ridge, NC 27310 / US
03 / SUMONTHEE, Jeffrey
3218 Turtle Cove
West Palm Beach, FL 33411 / US
04 / RENAUD, Benoit J.
30 Red Bud Trail
Newnan, GA 30263 / US
05 / PHILHOWER, Douglas H.
205 North Forke Drive
Advance, NC 27006 / US
06 / FORSYTHE, Patrick J.
149 Arbor Hill Avenue
Mocksville, NC 27028 / US
07 / NORMYLE, William M.
2002 Tory Drive
Yadkinville, NC 27055-8647 / US
Representative(s)Cross, James Peter Archibald , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2019/33]
Former [2013/48]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2013/42]Simmons, Philip Andrew
Clifton Cowley Legal
25 Meer Street
Stratford-upon-Avon, Warwickshire CV37 6QB / GB
Application number, filing date11847650.609.12.2011
[2019/33]
WO2011US64248
Priority number, dateUS20100421912P10.12.2010         Original published format: US 421912 P
[2013/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012079027
Date:14.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2649697
Date:16.10.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2012
[2013/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2649697
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.08.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:H02J5/00, E04H4/12, E04H4/16, H02J7/02, H02J7/35, H02J50/10
[2019/07]
Former International [2015/31]H02J5/00, E04H4/12, E04H4/16, H02J7/02, H02J7/35
Former International [2013/42]H02J5/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/42]
Extension statesBA10.07.2013
ME10.07.2013
TitleGerman:STROMVERSORGUNGEN FÜR SCHWIMMBAD UND SPA[2013/42]
English:POWER SUPPLIES FOR POOL AND SPA EQUIPMENT[2013/42]
French:ALIMENTATIONS POUR ÉQUIPEMENT DE PISCINE ET DE SPA[2013/42]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2013National basic fee paid 
10.07.2013Search fee paid 
10.07.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/42]
02.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
12.06.2019Fee for grant paid
12.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.07.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
05.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19191326.8
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.07.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[I]US2007247838  (FAN QUANWEI [CN]) [I] 1,4-6 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029]; figure 3 *;
 [XAYI]EP1657798  (DIMENSION ONE SPAS [US]) [X] 14-18,23,25,26 * the whole document * [A] 24,30,32-34 [Y] 19,20,28,29 [I] 21,22,27,31;
 [Y]US2004168299  (PORAT JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 19,20,28,29 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4838797  (DODIER PAUL J [US]) [A] 22 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US2004092181  (PORAT JOSEPH [US]);
 [Y]US2010252560  (CHURCHILL ROBERT LEE [US]);
 [Y]US2004168299  (PORAT JOSEPH [US], et al);
 [Y]US2006101567  (HUTCHINGS BRENT M [US]);
 [Y]US2007067930  (GARTI EFRAIM [IL]);
 [Y]US2007151914  (RILEY LOUIS F [US]);
 [Y]US2001032809  (HENKIN MELVYN L [US], et al)
ExaminationUS2005234595
 US2005253555
 EP1760564