Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2657738

EP2657738 - LENS ARRAY AND OPTICAL MODULE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.10.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Enplas Corporation
30-1, Namiki 2-chome Kawaguchi-shi
Saitama-ken 332-0034 / JP
[2013/44]
Inventor(s)01 / MORIOKA Shimpei
c/o Enplas Corporation
30-1 Namiki 2-chome
Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0034 / JP
02 / NIIMI Tadanobu
c/o Enplas Corporation
30-1 Namiki 2-chome
Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0034 / JP
03 / SHIBUYA Kazutaka
c/o Enplas Corporation
30-1 Namiki 2-chome
Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0034 / JP
 [2013/44]
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/44]Harrasz, Julia Konstanze
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date11851585.708.12.2011
WO2011JP78474
Priority number, dateJP2010028471821.12.2010         Original published format: JP 2010284718
[2013/44]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012086429
Date:28.06.2012
Language:JA
[2012/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2657738
Date:30.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.06.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/42, G02B6/32
[2017/43]
Former International [2013/44]G02B6/42
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/44]
TitleGerman:LINSENANORDNUNG UND OPTISCHES MODUL DAMIT[2013/44]
English:LENS ARRAY AND OPTICAL MODULE COMPRISING SAME[2013/44]
French:GROUPEMENT DE LENTILLES ET MODULE OPTIQUE LE COMPRENANT[2013/44]
Entry into regional phase14.05.2013Translation filed 
14.05.2013National basic fee paid 
14.05.2013Search fee paid 
14.05.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
14.05.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/44]
10.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.10.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]US2003081645  (UEBBING JOHN J [US]) [A] 1-3,6-9 * paragraphs [0028] - [0029]; figure 3 *;
 [A]US2008226228  (TAMURA KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,6-9 * paragraph [0117]; figure 1C *;
 [E]EP2650704  (ENPLAS CORP [JP]) [E] 1-3,6-9 * figure 20 *;
 [E]EP2518550  (ENPLAS CORP [JP]) [E] 1-3,6-9 * figure 7 *;
 [E]WO2013062004  (ENPLAS CORP [JP]) [E] 1-3,6-9 * figure 1 *;
 [E]EP2787379  (ENPLAS CORP [JP]) [E] 1-3,6-9 * figure 1 *
International search[Y]JP2010262222  (ENPLAS CORP);
 [Y]JP2009163213  (ENPLAS CORP);
 [A]JP2009229996  (ENPLAS CORP);
 [Y]JP2004085913  (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD, et al)
by applicantJP2006344915
 JP2010195737