EP2633736 - VACUUM ASSISTED CONFORMAL SHAPE SETTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bell Helicopter Textron Inc. P.O. Box 482 Fort Worth, TX 76101 / US | [2013/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITWORTH, Denver, R. 7504 Crosstimbers Lane North Richland Hills TX 76182 / US | 02 /
CRIBB, Vance, N. 304 Scenic View Drive Aledo TX 76008 / US | 03 /
NOTTORF, Eric, W. 5405 Turtle River Court Fort Worth TX 76137-3701 / US | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2015/11] |
Former [2013/36] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11854920.3 | 03.01.2011 | WO2011US20016 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012093992 | Date: | 12.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2633736 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2633736 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/02, A61G7/057, A61F5/058 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
H05B3/34 (EP,US);
A61F5/05833 (EP,US);
H05B2203/003 (EP,US);
H05B2203/014 (EP,US);
H05B2203/017 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/36] | H05B3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VAKUUMUNTERSTÜTZTE KONFORME FORMEINSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2013/36] | English: | VACUUM ASSISTED CONFORMAL SHAPE SETTING DEVICE | [2013/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION DE FORME CONFORMÉE À DÉPRESSION | [2013/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 13.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.01.2011 | AL | 11.03.2015 | AT | 11.03.2015 | BE | 11.03.2015 | BG | 11.03.2015 | CY | 11.03.2015 | CZ | 11.03.2015 | DK | 11.03.2015 | EE | 11.03.2015 | ES | 11.03.2015 | FI | 11.03.2015 | HR | 11.03.2015 | LT | 11.03.2015 | LV | 11.03.2015 | MC | 11.03.2015 | MK | 11.03.2015 | NL | 11.03.2015 | PL | 11.03.2015 | RO | 11.03.2015 | RS | 11.03.2015 | SE | 11.03.2015 | SI | 11.03.2015 | SK | 11.03.2015 | SM | 11.03.2015 | TR | 11.03.2015 | NO | 11.06.2015 | GR | 12.06.2015 | IS | 11.07.2015 | PT | 13.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 03.01.2011 | |
AT | 11.03.2015 | ||
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
BG | 11.03.2015 | ||
CY | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
SM | 11.03.2015 | ||
TR | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 03.01.2011 | |
AT | 11.03.2015 | ||
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
CY | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
SM | 11.03.2015 | ||
TR | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 03.01.2011 | |
AT | 11.03.2015 | ||
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
CY | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MK | 11.03.2015 | ||
MT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
SM | 11.03.2015 | ||
TR | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 03.01.2011 | |
AT | 11.03.2015 | ||
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
CY | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MK | 11.03.2015 | ||
MT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
SM | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 11.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1319377 (KOHLBRAT & BUNZ GMBH [AT]) [Y] 1-3,5,9,11 * paragraph [0011] *; | [Y]DE10228015 (MEDICAL INTELLIGENCE MEDIZINTE [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5,9,11 * paragraph [0017] *; | [A]WO0202181 (EMBRO CORP [US]) [A] 8,14 * page 17, line 20 - line 23 *; | [A]EP0267640 (PATENTICO LTD [GB]) [A] 1,9 * figure 1 * | International search | [Y]US2005021114 (HIDAKA); | [Y]US2009177184 (CHRISTENSEN ET AL); | [A]US2414125 (RHEINFRANK, JR); | [A]US6987209 (AUGUSTINE ET AL); | [A]GB1438184 (KAMOV ET AL) |