Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2669130

EP2669130 - VEHICLE DECELERATION CONTROL UNIT, VEHICLE DECELERATION CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
2 Takara-cho
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
[2017/43]
Former [2013/49]For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd
2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SUZUKI, Tatsuya
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
Intellectual Property Department 1-1
Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi
Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
02 / OURA, Kazuma
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
Intellectual Property Department 1-1
Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi
Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
 [2013/49]
Representative(s)Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
[2017/43]
Former [2013/49]Hoefer & Partner
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date11857150.421.12.2011
[2017/43]
WO2011JP07183
Priority number, dateJP2011001322625.01.2011         Original published format: JP 2011013226
JP2011014447029.06.2011         Original published format: JP 2011144470
JP2011014447129.06.2011         Original published format: JP 2011144471
[2013/49]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012101725
Date:02.08.2012
Language:JA
[2012/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2669130
Date:04.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2669130
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.08.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:B60W10/10, B60T8/00
[2015/15]
Former International [2013/49]B60W10/10, B60T8/00, B60W10/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STEUEREINHEIT ZUR ENTSCHLEUNIGUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS UND STEUERVERFAHREN ZUR ENTSCHLEUNIGUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS[2013/49]
English:VEHICLE DECELERATION CONTROL UNIT, VEHICLE DECELERATION CONTROL METHOD[2013/49]
French:UNITÉ DE RÉGULATION DE DÉCÉLÉRATION POUR VÉHICULE, PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION DE DÉCÉLÉRATION D'UN VÉHICULE[2013/49]
Entry into regional phase26.06.2013Translation filed 
26.06.2013National basic fee paid 
26.06.2013Search fee paid 
26.06.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/49]
04.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2017Fee for grant paid
13.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.07.2017
Opposition(s)26.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
30.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
30.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
30.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
IE21.12.2017
LU21.12.2017
MT21.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2018/52]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
IE21.12.2017
LU21.12.2017
MT21.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/50]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
IE21.12.2017
LU21.12.2017
MT21.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/45]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
IE21.12.2017
LU21.12.2017
MT21.12.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/43]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
LU21.12.2017
MT21.12.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL25.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[YA]US2007252432  (TAKAMATSU HIDEKI [JP]) [Y] 1-3,5,8,14 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0050]; figures 6-8 * [A] 4,6,7,9-13;
 [YA]US2005187694  (SHIIBA KAZUYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,8,14 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1A, 1B, 2, 7 * [A] 4,6,7,9-13
International search[A]JP2000062501  (NISSAN MOTOR);
 [A]JP2003306138  (NISSAN MOTOR)
by applicantJPH06323416
 JPS5973651
 JP2000065196