Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2670600

EP2670600 - THERMAL FLUID-EJECTION MECHANISM HAVING HEATING RESISTOR ON CAVITY SIDEWALLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.04.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.01.2020New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
10300 Energy Drive
Spring TX 77389 / US
[2019/20]
Former [2013/50]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, TX 77070 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MARDILOVICH, Peter
1000 NE Circle Blvd
Corvallis, Oregon 97330 / US
02 / WHITE, Lawrence H.
1000 NE Circle Blvd
Corvallis, Oregon 97330 / US
03 / TORNIAINEN, Erik D.
1000 NE Circle Blvd
Corvallis, Oregon 97330 / US
 [2013/50]
Representative(s)Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/50]Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler & Partner
P.O. Box 246
82043 Pullach / DE
Application number, filing date11857775.831.01.2011
WO2011US23224
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012105946
Date:09.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2670600
Date:11.12.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2012
[2013/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR09.08.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/14, B41J2/16
[2018/07]
Former International [2013/50]B41J2/175, B41J2/05, B41J2/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/50]
TitleGerman:WÄRMEFLÜSSIGKEITSAUSSTOSSMECHANISMUS MIT EINEM ERWÄRMUNGSWIDERSTAND AUF HOHLRAUMSEITENWÄNDEN[2013/50]
English:THERMAL FLUID-EJECTION MECHANISM HAVING HEATING RESISTOR ON CAVITY SIDEWALLS[2013/50]
French:MÉCANISME D'ÉJECTION THERMIQUE DE FLUIDE DOTÉ D'UNE RÉSISTANCE CHAUFFANTE SUR LES PAROIS LATÉRALES D'UNE CAVITÉ[2013/50]
Entry into regional phase19.07.2013National basic fee paid 
19.07.2013Search fee paid 
19.07.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/50]
13.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.04.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
23.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
24.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
24.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
24.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
21.01.2020Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XAY]JP2001341309  (SHARP KK) [X] 1,2,6,9,10 * paragraph [0026]; figures 1,2,4 * [A] 3-5,7,8,11-14 [Y] 15;
 [Y]US2002109755  (MEYER NEAL W [US]) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0006]; figures 6,7 *
International search[Y]US7475966  (FUJII KENJI [JP], et al);
 [Y]US2009009562  (PARK SUNG JOON [KR], et al);
 [A]US2006038855  (KIM KYONG-IL [KR], et al);
 [Y]US6378984  (STEINFIELD STEVEN WARREN [US], et al)