Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2675209

EP2675209 - WIRELESS DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, WIRELESS TERMINAL DEVICE AND WIRELESS BASE STATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.03.2018
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2018Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2013/51]For all designated states
Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KAWASAKI, Yoshihiro
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
02 / OHTA, Yoshiaki
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
 [2013/51]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/51]Lewin, David Nicholas
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date11858261.810.02.2011
WO2011JP52916
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012108045
Date:16.08.2012
Language:JA
[2012/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2675209
Date:18.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP16.08.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W28/04, H04W74/08
[2017/08]
Former International [2013/51]H04W28/04, H04L1/16, H04W56/00, H04W74/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/51]
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSES DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, DRAHTLOSES ENDGERÄT UND DRAHTLOSE BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG[2013/51]
English:WIRELESS DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, WIRELESS TERMINAL DEVICE AND WIRELESS BASE STATION DEVICE[2013/51]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES SANS FIL, SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATIONS, DISPOSITIF DE TERMINAL SANS FIL ET DISPOSITIF DE STATION DE BASE SANS FIL[2013/51]
Entry into regional phase12.07.2013Translation filed 
04.09.2013National basic fee paid 
04.09.2013Search fee paid 
04.09.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.09.2013Examination requested  [2013/51]
13.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.02.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
05.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
04.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
03.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
05.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
19.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010085929  (HARADA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,11,12 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] * * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] , [0027] * * paragraphs [0053] , [0054] , [0 56] - [0059] * * paragraphs [0060] , [0061] * [I] 2-5;
 [XI]US2009270094  (ITO AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,11,12 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0035] , [0036] , [0069] , [0 80] , [0 81] , [0115] * [I] 2-5;
 [I]EP2124488  (SHARP KK [JP]) [I] 1-5,9,11,12 * paragraphs [0053] - [0055] *;
 [A]  - "Uplink synchronization", no. R2-070781, (20070212), pages 1 - 3, 3GPP TSG RAN WG2 #57 12TH ? 16TH FEBRUARY 2007 ST. LOUIS, USA, XX, XX, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_57/Documents/, XP008135975 [A] 1-5,9,11,12 * §2.1 *
International search[X]JP2008244526  (NTT DOCOMO INC);
 [A]WO2008111606  (SHARP KK [JP], et al);
 [A]JP2010502065  (IP WIRELESS, INC.)
by applicantJP2008155935
 JP2007139188
 JP2009536502