Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2725825

EP2725825 - WIRELESS LOCAL AREA NETWORK COOPERATED DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020  [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2018/15]
Former [2014/18]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Rui
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / DU, Yinggang
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / CHENG, Hong
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2014/18]
Representative(s)Körber, Martin Hans , et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[2014/18]
Application number, filing date11866038.026.07.2011
[2018/15]
WO2011CN77605
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012159344
Date:29.11.2012
Language:ZH
[2012/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2725825
Date:30.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2725825
Date:11.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN29.11.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W8/08
[2014/30]
Former International [2014/18]H04W4/04, H04W8/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM FÜR KOOPERATIVE DATENÜBERTRAGUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN LOKALEN NETZWERK[2014/18]
English:WIRELESS LOCAL AREA NETWORK COOPERATED DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM[2014/18]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES COLLABORATIVES DANS UN RÉSEAU LOCAL SANS FIL, ET DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME ASSOCIÉS[2014/18]
Entry into regional phase24.01.2014Translation filed 
24.01.2014National basic fee paid 
24.01.2014Search fee paid 
24.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/18]
16.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2018Fee for grant paid
27.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.10.2017
Opposition(s)14.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
28.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
IE26.07.2018
LU26.07.2018
MT26.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
FR31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/26]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
IE26.07.2018
LU26.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
FR31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/23]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
IE26.07.2018
LU26.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
FR31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/21]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
IE26.07.2018
LU26.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/19]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
IE26.07.2018
LU26.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/17]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
LU26.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/12]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL11.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2254382  (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0063] * * claims 1-15 *;
 [A]US2010296499  (KARAOGUZ JEYHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0109] * * claims 1-24 *;
 [A]WO2005039127  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0074] *;
 [A]US2010016022  (LIU CHARLES [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0069] *;
 [A]US2009274104  (ADDY KENNETH [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0050] * * claims 1-22 *;
 [A]WO2011028954  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0060] * * claims 1-41 *;
 [A]US2009147750  (SCHINDLER SIGRAM [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0165] *;
 [A]US2010296487  (KARAOGUZ JEYHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] *
International search[A]US2010296499  (KARAOGUZ JEYHAN [US], et al);
 [A]US2010296487  (KARAOGUZ JEYHAN [US], et al);
 [A]CN101895929  (BROADCOM CORP);
 [A]CN102026411  (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO);
 [A]CN101945435  (SHANGHAI DINGZHU COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD)