Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2717140

EP2717140 - EQUIPMENT CONTROL DEVICE, OPERATION RECEPTION METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.11.2019
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2019/02]
Former [2014/15]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ISHIZAKA, Taichi
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2019/02]
Former [2014/15]01 / ISHIZAKA Taichi
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[2019/02]
Former [2014/15]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 13
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date11866131.324.05.2011
[2019/02]
WO2011JP61890
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012160653
Date:29.11.2012
Language:JA
[2012/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2717140
Date:09.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2717140
Date:09.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.11.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0488, G06F3/048, G06F3/041, // G05B19/042, H04L12/28, G06F3/0481
[2018/21]
Former International [2014/49]G06F3/048, G06F3/041, // H04L12/28
Former International [2014/15]G06F3/048, G06F3/041
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:GERÄTESTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, OPERATIONSEMPFANGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM[2014/15]
English:EQUIPMENT CONTROL DEVICE, OPERATION RECEPTION METHOD, AND PROGRAM[2014/15]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'ÉQUIPEMENT, PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION DE COMMANDE ET PROGRAMME[2014/15]
Entry into regional phase13.12.2013Translation filed 
13.12.2013National basic fee paid 
13.12.2013Search fee paid 
13.12.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.12.2013Examination requested  [2014/15]
02.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
23.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2018Fee for grant paid
30.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.08.2015
Opposition(s)10.10.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL09.01.2019
AT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
IT09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
MC09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
SM09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
[2020/07]
Former [2019/52]AL09.01.2019
AT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
IT09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
SM09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/49]AL09.01.2019
AT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
IT09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/48]AT09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
IT09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/46]AT09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
IT09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/39]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/38]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL09.01.2019
Documents cited:Search[I]US2010328438  (OHYAMA TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0099]; figures 3A, 5,-7 * * paragraph [0146] - paragraph [0162]; figures 15,16A-16C, 17A,17B *;
 [I]US2007132721  (GLOMSKI WILLIAM E [US], et al) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0030]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0052] - [0060]; figure 6 *;
 [A]EP1881649  (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6-8 * paragraphs [0015] - [0021]; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP2323023  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 4,5 * paragraphs [0024] - [0027] * * paragraphs [0062] - [0064]; figure 9 *;
 [A]US2010095206  (KIM HYUN JU [KR]) [A] 1,4,5,7,8 * paragraphs [0077] - [0079]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0086] * * paragraphs [0090] - [0098]; figures 8-10 *;
 [A]US5825352  (BISSET STEPHEN J [US], et al) [A] 4,5 * column 12, line 14 - column 13, line 58; figures 7A-7F *
International search[Y]JPH11110455  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al);
 [X]JP2011013778  (SONY CORP);
 [X]JP2011081480  (SEIKO EPSON CORP)
ExaminationUS2011083106
by applicantJP2010055266
 JP2008153025