Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2715027

EP2715027 - FACADE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.06.2016
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.07.2016  [2016/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung E.V.
Hansastrasse 27C
80686 München / DE
[2014/15]
Inventor(s)01 / PARK, Sumee
Rotdornweg 7
82024 Taufkirchen / DE
 [2014/15]
Representative(s)Andrae Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Uhlandstrasse 2
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/24]Andrae Westendorp
Uhlandstrasse 2
80336 München / DE
Former [2014/15]Goeden, Christian
Andrae Westendorp
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Balanstrasse 55
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date11866573.631.05.2011
WO2011IB52393
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012164349
Date:06.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2715027
Date:09.04.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2012
[2014/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.12.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:E06B7/02, E06B7/10, F24F13/08, B01D39/00, E06B9/52
[2015/28]
Former International [2014/15]E06B7/02, E06B7/10, F24F13/08, B01D39/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/15]
TitleGerman:FASSADENELEMENT[2014/15]
English:FACADE ELEMENT[2014/15]
French:ÉLÉMENT DE FAÇADE[2014/15]
Entry into regional phase09.12.2013National basic fee paid 
09.12.2013Search fee paid 
09.12.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.12.2013Examination requested  [2014/15]
08.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/28]
15.02.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US1771569  (BENOIT DELOR J) [X] 1-6,9,11-13 * page 2, line 70 - page 3, line 14; figures 7-10 *;
 [I]US6213187  (HUGHES GARY M [US]) [I] 1-8,10,11 * column 5, line 20 - column 7, line 11; figures 2-3,8,10 *;
 [X]US2779401  (BASCOM HUGH W) [X] 1,5,6,11 * column 3, lines 10-53; figure 4 *;
 [I]US1238704  (WENDELKEN ALBERT C [US]) [I] 1-6,8-11 * page 2, lines 32-60; figure 1 *
International search[X]JP2001311372  (KASURU CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2010196293  (SANKYO TATEYAMA ALUMINIUM INC.);
 [A]KR950008905  (KIM, HAN-JOO);
 [A]US7320637  (LACK, NICHOLAS L.)