Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012164349 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011IB52393 | 31.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140019441 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011IB52393 | 31.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2715027 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2015 | A4 | EP2715027 | 09.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011IB52393 | 31.05.2011 |