blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2756729 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2756729



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 189
04.03.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
24.01.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.01.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
04.01.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
04.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.12.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
03.12.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
03.12.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
03.12.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 23
03.12.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 23
28.06.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
08.06.2018 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 3
08.06.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
29.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
29.01.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.09.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
28.09.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.09.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
31.03.2017 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.03.2017 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Search / examination 1
09.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.01.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 5
02.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.12.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
02.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
02.12.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
02.12.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
02.12.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
02.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.06.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
26.05.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.05.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 2
26.05.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
12.05.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
11.05.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
04.05.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 5
25.06.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
14.05.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
23.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.04.2014 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
10.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.04.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
10.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
10.04.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
01.04.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
24.01.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
21.03.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
21.03.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 24