blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2756729


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.01.2019 (Expected) grant published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
15.01.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
15.01.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
10.01.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
02.12.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.10.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.07.2018 Change - representative
25.06.2018 Change - representative
31.01.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.10.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.09.2017 First examination report
29.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.12.2015 Amendment by applicant
02.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.05.2015 Change - classification published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
22.05.2015 Change - classification published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
22.05.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
07.05.2015 Change - representative
21.11.2014 Change - extension states published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
03.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.06.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]
20.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]
07.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.04.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.04.2014 Amendment by applicant
11.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
22.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication