blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2756729
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013039435Global Dossier 21.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011SE51117 16.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9301323Global Dossier 29.03.2016B2
US2014362794 11.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2011SE51117 16.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2756729Global Dossier 20.02.2019B1
EP2756729 24.06.2015A4
EP2756729 23.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2011SE51117 16.09.2011