Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2756729

EP2756729 - IMPROVED CONTENTION-FREE RANDOM ACCESS PROCEDURE IN WIRELESS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.12.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 20.02.2019  [2019/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2019/08]
Former [2014/30]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / ZHAO, Wei
Gustav III:s Boulevard 109
S-169 74 Solna / SE
02 / TYNDERFELDT, Tobias
Honnörsgatan 19
S-170 69 Solna / SE
 [2014/30]
Representative(s)Brann AB
P.O. Box 3690
Drottninggatan 27
103 59 Stockholm / SE
[2019/08]
Former [2014/30]Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit Kista RAN 1
Torshamnsgatan 23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date11872520.916.09.2011
[2019/08]
WO2011SE51117
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013039435
Date:21.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2756729
Date:23.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2013
[2014/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2756729
Date:20.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE21.03.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W74/04, H04W36/00, H04W56/00
[2014/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTEA KONFLIKTFREIES DIREKTZUGRIFFSVERFAHREN IN DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERKEN[2014/30]
English:IMPROVED CONTENTION-FREE RANDOM ACCESS PROCEDURE IN WIRELESS NETWORKS[2014/30]
French:PROCÉDURE AMÉLIORÉE D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE SANS CONFLIT DANS LES RÉSEAUX SANS FIL[2014/30]
Entry into regional phase10.04.2014National basic fee paid 
10.04.2014Search fee paid 
10.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/30]
02.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.01.2019Fee for grant paid
04.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.09.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2010143846  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0054] * * figure 6 *;
 EP2442470  [ ] (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR])
 [XI]  - ZTE, "Message 3 aspect for DL data arrival case", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-080028 MESSAGE 3 ASPECT FOR DL DATA ARRIVAL CASE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080108), vol. RAN WG2, no. Sevilla, Spain; 20080108, XP050137929 [X] 1,3,6-9,13-15 * the whole document * [I] 2
International search[A]WO2010077122  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al);
 [X]  - ZTE, "Message 3 aspect for DL data arrival case", 3GPP TSG RAN WG2 #60BIS R2-080028, SEVILLA, SPAIN, (20080114), XP050137929
 [A]  - "Generation Partners Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA) and Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN);Overall description; Stage 2 (Release 10)", 3GPP TS 36.300 V10.4.0, (201106), XP055148335
 [A]  - "Handover Failure and RRC re-establishment", 3GPP TSG RAN WG2 MEETING #61 R2-080741, SORRENTO, ITALY, (20080211), XP050138568
 [A]  - SAMSUNG, "Using Restricted Preamble Set for RACH in High Mobility Environments", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #49 R1-072234, KOBE, JAPAN, (20070507), XP050105967
ExaminationEP1973366