blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2762175

EP2762175 - MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR FIBROUS DEMINERALIZED BONE MATRIX [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 19.08.2020  [2020/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CG Bio Co., Ltd.
223-23 Sangdaewon-dong Joongwon-gu Ngnam
Kyunggi-do 462-120 / KR
[2014/32]
Inventor(s)01 / SONG, Seok-Beom
Samik Gumgwang Apt. 102-606
3950 Gumgwang 2-dong
Joogwon-gu
Seongnam Gyeonggi-do 462-242 / KR
02 / JEONG, Goo-Won
401
23-4 Seokchon-dong
Songpa-gu
Seoul 138-190 / KR
03 / SO, Jung-Won
50-3 (401) Gumi-dong
Bundang-gu
Seongnam Gyeonggi-do 463-500 / KR
04 / SEO, Han-Sol
B-405 Hanyang Unnam Mansion
Inhu 2-dong
Deokjin-gu
Jeonju Jeollabuk-do 561-232 / KR
05 / RYU, Hyun-Seung
Hoban Vertium Apt. 801-1301
Cheongdeok-dong
Giheung-gu
Yongin Gyeonggi-do 446-915 / KR
06 / KIM, Giue-Nam
90-25 Samseong-dong
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 135-090 / KR
07 / KIM, Byoung-Suck
244 Galmachri-ro
Jungwon-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2015/16]
Former [2014/52]01 / SONG, Seok-Beom
Samik Gumgwang Apt. 102-606
3950 Gumgwang 2-dong
Joogwon-gu
Seongnam Gyeonggi-do 462-242 / KR
02 / JEONG, Goo-Won
401
23-4 Seokchon-dong
Songpa-gu
Seoul 138-190 / KR
03 / SO, Jung-Won
50-3 (401) Gumi-dong
Bundang-gu
Seongnam Gyeonggi-do 463-500 / KR
04 / SEO, Han-Sol
B-405 Hanyang Unnam Mansion
Inhu 2-dong
Deokjin-gu
Jeonju Jeollabuk-do 561-232 / KR
05 / RYU, Hyun-Seung
Hoban Vertium Apt. 801-1301
Cheongdeok-dong
Giheung-gu
Yongin Gyeonggi-do 446-915 / KR
06 / KIM, Giue-Nam
90-25 Samseong-dong
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 135-090 / KR
07 / KIM, Byoung-Suck
233 Seonryu-ro 269
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-867 / KR
Former [2014/32]01 / SONG, Seok-Beom
Samik Gumgwang Apt. 102-606
3950 Gumgwang 2-dong
Joogwon-gu
Seongnam Gyeonggi-do 462-242 / KR
02 / JEONG, Goo-Won
401
23-4 Seokchon-dong
Songpa-gu
Seoul 138-190 / KR
03 / SO, Jung-Won
50-3 (401) Gumi-dong
Bundang-gu
Seongnam Gyeonggi-do 463-500 / KR
04 / SEO, Han-Sol
B-405 Hanyang Unnam Mansion
Inhu 2-dong
Deokjin-gu
Jeonju Jeollabuk-do 561-232 / KR
05 / RYU, Hyun-Seung
Hoban Vertium Apt. 801-1301
Cheongdeok-dong
Giheung-gu
Yongin Gyeonggi-do 446-915 / KR
06 / KIM, Giue-Nam
90-25 Samseong-dong
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 135-090 / KR
07 / KIM, Byoung-Suck
Gangbyun Raemian Apt. 303-502
376 Dangsan-dong
Youngdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-942 / KR
Representative(s)Turner, Craig Robert
AA Thornton IP LLP
8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street
London EC2N 1AR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/03]Turner, Craig Robert
A.A. Thornton & Co.
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
Former [2014/32]Turner, Craig Robert
A.A. Thornton & Co.
235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date11873106.611.10.2011
[2017/03]
WO2011KR07517
Priority number, dateKR2011009901629.09.2011         Original published format: KR 20110099016
[2014/32]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2013047936
Date:04.04.2013
Language:KO
[2013/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2762175
Date:06.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2762175
Date:18.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.04.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2015
ClassificationIPC:A61F2/28, C12N5/071, A61L27/36
[2015/23]
CPC:
A61L27/3683 (EP,US); A61L27/38 (KR); A61F2/28 (EP,KR);
A61L27/3608 (EP,US); A61L27/365 (EP,US); A61L27/3687 (EP,US);
C12N5/0602 (KR); A61F2002/2835 (EP); A61F2002/2839 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4645 (EP,US); A61L2430/02 (EP,US); A61L2430/40 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2014/32]A61L27/38, A61F2/28, C12N5/071
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/32]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE FASERIGE DEMINERALISIERTE KNOCHENMATRIX[2014/32]
English:MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR FIBROUS DEMINERALIZED BONE MATRIX[2014/32]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION POUR UNE MATRICE OSSEUSE DÉMINÉRALISÉE FIBREUSE[2014/32]
Entry into regional phase13.03.2014Translation filed 
13.03.2014National basic fee paid 
13.03.2014Search fee paid 
13.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/32]
11.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.2016Fee for grant paid
06.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.09.2016
Opposition(s)19.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.10.2011
AL18.01.2017
AT18.01.2017
CY18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
MK18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
TR18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
IE11.10.2017
LU11.10.2017
MT11.10.2017
[2020/34]
Former [2020/15]HU11.10.2011
AT18.01.2017
CY18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
MK18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
TR18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
IE11.10.2017
LU11.10.2017
MT11.10.2017
Former [2019/51]HU11.10.2011
AT18.01.2017
CY18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
MK18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
IE11.10.2017
LU11.10.2017
MT11.10.2017
Former [2019/46]HU11.10.2011
AT18.01.2017
CY18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
IE11.10.2017
LU11.10.2017
MT11.10.2017
Former [2019/31]HU11.10.2011
AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
IE11.10.2017
LU11.10.2017
MT11.10.2017
Former [2018/45]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
IE11.10.2017
LU11.10.2017
MT11.10.2017
Former [2018/43]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
LU11.10.2017
MT11.10.2017
Former [2018/36]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
LU11.10.2017
Former [2018/29]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2018/14]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/51]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/50]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/49]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
IT18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/48]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/41]AT18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO0247732  (OSTEOTECH INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-4* page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 10; example - *;
 [Y]US2004097612  (ROSENBERG ARON D [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 44] , [0 46] , [0 47]; examples 1,2,5,6 *
International search[A]JP2004515318  (OSTEOTECH, INC.);
 [A]KR20100047412  (HANS BIOMED COR [KR]);
 [A]  - LEE, DU YEONG, "Comparison in demineralizaion resistance of resin infiltration and 1.23% acidulated phosphate fluoride in bovine teeth", YONSEI UNIVERSITY, THESIS FOR MASTER'S DEGREE, (201012), XP055151480
by applicantUS5607269
 US7323193
 US7939108
 KR101041784B
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.