Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2761524

EP2761524 - SECURE DISPLAY FOR SECURE TRANSACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/32]For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
MS: RNB-4-150
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SARANGDHAR, Nitin V.
12370 NW Woodland Court
Portland, Oregon 97229 / US
02 / AVADHANAM, Satyanarayana
4270 Rimini Way
El Dorado Hills, California 95762 / US
03 / KAMBHATLA, Srikanth
5373 NW Paseo Terrace
Portland, Oregon 97229 / US
 [2014/32]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/32]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date11873403.730.09.2011
WO2011US54468
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013048519
Date:04.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2761524
Date:06.08.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013
[2014/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.04.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/10, G06F21/30, G09G5/14, G06F3/14
[2015/20]
Former International [2014/32]G06F21/10, G06F21/30, G06F3/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/32]
TitleGerman:SICHERE ANZEIGEN FÜR SICHERE TRANSAKTIONEN[2014/32]
English:SECURE DISPLAY FOR SECURE TRANSACTIONS[2014/32]
French:DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE SÉCURISÉ POUR DES TRANSACTIONS SÉCURISÉES[2014/32]
Entry into regional phase21.03.2014National basic fee paid 
21.03.2014Search fee paid 
21.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/32]
03.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/24]
06.02.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/24]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.08.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201808   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2007199051  (PARIKH SUJAL S [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0039] , [0047] - [0049] *;
 [Y]US2010169640  (SMITH NED [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0026] , [0032] *;
 [Y]US2009089588  (ADRANGI FARID [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0019] *
International search[Y]KR101027228B  (HONG SEUNG EUI [KR]);
 [A]KR20100085902  (DE MONSEIGNAT BERNARD [FR], et al);
 [A]US2010024036  (MOROZOV ARTIOM [BY], et al)
 [Y]  - TARJEI MANDT, "Kernel Attacks through User-Mode Callbacks", (20110812), page 48,62, URL: http://blogs.norman.com, XP055153256
by applicantUS2007199051
 US2010169640
 US2009089588