Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2765669

EP2765669 - VEHICLE CHARGING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CHARGING VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2017Deletion: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
For all designated states
Subaru Corporation
1-20-8, Ebisu
Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 150-8554 / JP
[2017/31]
Former [2014/46]For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
For all designated states
Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-20-8, Ebisu
Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 150-8554 / JP
Former [2014/33]For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
For all designated states
Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 160-8316 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MASUDA, Tomokazu
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
02 / HIDAKA, Tatsuo
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
03 / SHAMOTO, Sumikazu
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
04 / KANIE, Naoki
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
05 / MACHIDA, Kiyohito
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
06 / MATSUDA, Kazuhiko
c/o FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 160-8316 / JP
 [2014/33]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/33]
Application number, filing date11873695.807.10.2011
WO2011JP73205
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013051151
Date:11.04.2013
Language:JA
[2013/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2765669
Date:13.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.04.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H02J7/00, B60L11/18, H01M10/44, H01M10/48, H02J7/10, G05F1/66, H01M10/46, H01M10/42
[2015/41]
Former International [2014/33]H02J7/00, B60L11/18, H01M10/44, H01M10/48, H02J7/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/33]
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUGLADESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES FAHRZEUGS[2014/33]
English:VEHICLE CHARGING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CHARGING VEHICLE[2014/33]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA CHARGE D'UN VÉHICULE[2014/33]
Entry into regional phase15.04.2014Translation filed 
15.04.2014National basic fee paid 
15.04.2014Search fee paid 
15.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.03.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
15.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/33]
03.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/47]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.11.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2011175576  (UESAKA SHINICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0085]; figures 3,4,5 * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0111] * * figure 7 * [I] 3,6;
 [XI]US2011118919  (PARK JUNE KYU [KR], et al) [X] 1,7 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0058]; figure 2 * [I] 2-4,6;
 [XI]US2010019729  (KAITA KEIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,7 * paragraph [0172] - paragraph [0175]; figure 12 * [I] 2-4,6;
 [X]WO2011073765  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,7 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025]; figure 5b *;
 [I]US2009021218  (KELTY KURT RUSSELL [US], et al) [I] 1,7 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0046]; figure 7 *
International search[X]JP2011151891  (SONY CORP);
 [Y]WO2010084598  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al)
by applicantJP3554057B