Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784277

EP2784277 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
[2018/29]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HASHIDA, Tatsuhiro
c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
02 / NISHIJIMA, Hiroki
c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
 [2018/52]
Former [2014/40]01 / HASHIDA, Tatsuhiro
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
02 / NISHIJIMA, Hiroki
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date11876112.125.11.2011
[2018/52]
WO2011JP77210
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013076869
Date:30.05.2013
Language:JA
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784277
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2784277
Date:26.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:F01N3/023, F01N3/08, F01N3/20, F01N11/00, F01N3/035
[2015/19]
Former International [2014/40]F01N3/023, F01N3/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR[2014/40]
English:CONTROL DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE[2014/40]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DESTINÉ À UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase03.04.2014Translation filed 
03.04.2014National basic fee paid 
03.04.2014Search fee paid 
03.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.05.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
03.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
27.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.2018Fee for grant paid
29.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.06.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL26.12.2018
AT26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
EE26.12.2018
ES26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
IT26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RO26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
SK26.12.2018
SM26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
IS26.04.2019
PT26.04.2019
[2019/46]
Former [2019/39]AL26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
EE26.12.2018
ES26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
IT26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RO26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
SK26.12.2018
SM26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
IS26.04.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/37]AL26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
EE26.12.2018
ES26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
IT26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RO26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
SM26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/35]AL26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
ES26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
IT26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/34]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
IT26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/33]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/30]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/25]FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/24]FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/23]FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
NO26.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT26.12.2018
NO26.03.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2010229957  (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0017] , [0026]; figures 1,2 * * abstract *;
 [A]JP2011185167  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2011021479  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *
International search[Y]JP2010229957  (NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2011021479  (HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2011185167  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.)
by applicantJP2009144577