Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783345

EP2783345 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR AN ARTIFACT DETECTION SCHEME BASED ON IMAGE CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.09.2017  [2017/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / GU, Xiaodong
8th Floor Building A Technology Fortune Center
No. 8 Xueqing Road
Haidian District
Beijing 100192 / CN
02 / LIU, Debing
8th Floor Building A Technology Fortune Center
No. 8 Xueqing Road
Haidian District
Beijing 100192 / CN
03 / CHEN, Zhibo
8th Floor Building A Technology Fortune Center
No. 8 Xueqing Road
Haidian District
Beijing 100192 / CN
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Huchet, Anne
Technicolor
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date11876119.624.11.2011
WO2011CN82873
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013075319
Date:30.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783345
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN30.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04N19/117, H04N19/14, H04N19/17, H04N19/895
[2015/42]
Former International [2014/40]G06T7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR AUF BILDINHALT BASIERENDES SCHEMA ZUM NACHWEIS VON ARTEFAKTEN[2014/40]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR AN ARTIFACT DETECTION SCHEME BASED ON IMAGE CONTENT[2014/40]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR UNE MÉTHODE DE DÉTECTION D'ARTÉFACTS BASÉE SUR UN CONTENU D'IMAGE[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase19.06.2014National basic fee paid 
19.06.2014Search fee paid 
19.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
12.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/37]
10.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/37]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.11.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2009080517  (KO YU-LING [TW] ET AL) [X] 1-5,15 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] * * figure 7 * [Y] 6-14;
 [Y]WO2010126437  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]; SJOEBERG RICKARD [SE]; ANDERSSON KENNETH) [Y] 6-11 * page 15, line 22 - line 29 *;
 [Y]US2010142844  (PEREIRA ROCHELLE [US] ET AL) [Y] 7-11 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0059] *;
 [Y]US2003011679  (JUNG JOEL [FR] ET AL) [Y] 12-14 * paragraph [0024] *
International search[X]CN101527842  (REALTEK SEMICONDUCTOR CORP);
 [Y]US6028909  (TOSFFFBA KK);
 [A]WO2010126437  (ERICSSON TELEFONAB L M)