Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783891

EP2783891 - VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.06.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019New entry: Payment of fee for grant 
21.10.2019New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / ICHIKAWA, Shinji
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
02 / HORIUCHI, Satoru
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date11876184.025.11.2011
WO2011JP77225
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013076870
Date:30.05.2013
Language:JA
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783891
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:B60L53/12, H02J50/12, H02J50/70
[2019/22]
Former International [2015/48]B60K1/04, B60L11/18, H02J17/00, B60L11/12, B60L11/14, B60K7/00, B60K17/04
Former International [2014/40]B60K1/04, B60L11/18, H02J17/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUG[2014/40]
English:VEHICLE[2014/40]
French:VÉHICULE[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase23.05.2014Translation filed 
23.05.2014National basic fee paid 
23.05.2014Search fee paid 
23.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
24.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.10.2019Fee for grant paid
18.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.12.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2011114208  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,11 * figures 1, 6, 11-17; claim 1 * * paragraphs [0022], [0043]-[0047], [0060]-[0074], [0087] * [I] 4,5,9,10;
 [A]EP2344359  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 5 * paragraphs [0023]-[0026];; figures 3A,3B *;
 [A]JP2011121456  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 9 * paragraph [0045];; figure 4 *;
 [A]JP2010130800  (JAPAN RADIO CO LTD) [A] 10 * paragraphs [0036]-[0037];; figure 5 *
International search[X]JP2011193671  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP);
 [Y]WO2010041320  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al);
 [Y]JP2010098257  (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV, et al);
 [Y]JP2011229360  (NISSAN MOTOR);
 [Y]JP2010130800  (JAPAN RADIO CO LTD)
by applicantJP2010070048
 JP2008288889
 JP2010098257