Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784450

EP2784450 - ROTATIONAL-ANGLE DETECTION DEVICE AND ELECTRIC POWER-STEERING DEVICE PROVIDED WITH ROTATIONAL-ANGLE DETECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
[2017/27]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YANAI, Kohei
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
02 / AOKI, Kenichiro
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
 [2017/27]
Former [2014/40]01 / YANAI Kohei
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
02 / AOKI Kenichiro
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date11876250.924.11.2011
[2017/27]
WO2011JP77038
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013076839
Date:30.05.2013
Language:JA
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784450
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2784450
Date:05.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01D5/14, B62D5/04, G01B7/31, // G01D3/02
[2015/19]
Former International [2014/40]G01D5/12, G01D5/14, G01D5/244
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DREHWINKELERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRISCHE LENKVORRICHTUNG MIT DER DREHWINKELERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2014/40]
English:ROTATIONAL-ANGLE DETECTION DEVICE AND ELECTRIC POWER-STEERING DEVICE PROVIDED WITH ROTATIONAL-ANGLE DETECTION DEVICE[2014/40]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'ANGLE DE ROTATION ET DISPOSITIF DE DIRECTION ASSISTÉE COMPORTANT UN DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'ANGLE DE ROTATION[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase19.05.2014Translation filed 
19.05.2014National basic fee paid 
19.05.2014Search fee paid 
19.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.05.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
19.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
22.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.05.2017Fee for grant paid
18.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16157403.3  / EP3045870
EP16157405.8  / EP3045871
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.01.2017
Opposition(s)06.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.11.2011
AT05.07.2017
CY05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
GB24.11.2017
IE24.11.2017
LU24.11.2017
MT24.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU24.11.2011
AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
GB24.11.2017
IE24.11.2017
LU24.11.2017
MT24.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/50]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
GB24.11.2017
IE24.11.2017
LU24.11.2017
MT24.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/49]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
IE24.11.2017
LU24.11.2017
MT24.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/45]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
IE24.11.2017
LU24.11.2017
MT24.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/43]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
LU24.11.2017
MT24.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/39]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
LU24.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/33]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/24]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/23]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
NO05.10.2017
Former [2018/09]FI05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
NO05.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
NO05.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT05.07.2017
NO05.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]US4924180  (NASR ALI M [US] ET AL) [A] 1,8-11 * column 2, line 60 - line 62 * * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 7; figures 1,2 * * column 4, line 45 - line 65; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]EP1762826  (AUSTRIAMICROSYSTEMS AG [AT]) [A] 1,8-11 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0016] , [0028] , [0031]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045]; figure 6 *;
 [A]US2008148808  (VASILOIU VICTOR [AT]) [A] 1,8-11 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0046]; figures 2b, 2c *;
 [A]US6320344  (SAKAMOTO KEIJI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1,8-11 * column 4, line 22 - line 33 * * column 4, line 34 - line 58; figures 3A, 3B *
International search[X]JP2009508119  (AUSTRIAMICROSYSTEMS AG.);
 [Y]JPS5377551  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2009040224  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.);
 [Y]JPH1127973  (FANUC LTD.);
 [Y]JP2011230531  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.);
 [Y]JP2009006923  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.)
by applicantJP2011169716