Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2784450


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
11.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.11.2019  [2019/46]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
02.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
07.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
13.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
11.05.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
16.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
19.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
12.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
02.06.2017 (Expected) grant published on  05.07.2017  [2017/27]
02.06.2017 Change - inventor
02.06.2017 Change - applicant published on  05.07.2017  [2017/27]
31.05.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
24.05.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
24.05.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
17.01.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.12.2016 Change - classification published on  11.01.2017  [2017/02]
09.12.2016 Change - classification published on  11.01.2017  [2017/02]
14.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.03.2016 Change - inventor
26.02.2016 Amendment by applicant
26.02.2016 Change - divisional application(s) published on  30.03.2016  [2016/13]
26.02.2016 Change - inventor
13.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.07.2015 Change - classification published on  26.08.2015  [2015/35]
24.07.2015 Change - classification published on  26.08.2015  [2015/35]
24.07.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  26.08.2015  [2015/35]
05.04.2015 Change - classification published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
05.04.2015 Change - classification published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
30.01.2015 Change - extension states published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
14.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
29.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
25.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
27.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.05.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
07.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
31.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication