Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2749115

EP2749115 - CONTROLLING TRANSITIONS BETWEEN RADIO RESOURCE CONTROL (RRC) STATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2017/16]
Former [2014/27]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / HANNU, Hans
Batterivägen 12
S-97631 Luleå / SE
02 / CHRISTOFFERSSON, Jan
Stenåsvägen 13
S-97596 Luleå / SE
 [2014/27]
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2017/16]Boco IP Oy Ab
Itämerenkatu 5
00180 Helsinki / FI
Former [2014/27]Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit Kista RAN 1
Torshamnsgatan 23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date11876349.925.11.2011
[2017/16]
WO2011SE51428
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013077792
Date:30.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2749115
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2749115
Date:19.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE30.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W76/04, H04W52/02
[2016/46]
Former International [2014/27]H04W76/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STEUERUNG VON ÜBERGÄNGEN ZWISCHEN FUNKRESSOURCENSTEUERUNGSZUSTÄNDEN[2014/27]
English:CONTROLLING TRANSITIONS BETWEEN RADIO RESOURCE CONTROL (RRC) STATES[2014/27]
French:COMMANDE DE TRANSITIONS ENTRE DES ÉTATS DE COMMANDE DE RESSOURCES RADIOÉLECTRIQUES[2014/27]
Entry into regional phase26.03.2014National basic fee paid 
26.03.2014Search fee paid 
26.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/27]
24.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2017Fee for grant paid
08.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.11.2015
Opposition(s)22.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.11.2011
AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
MC19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
IE25.11.2017
LU25.11.2017
MT25.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/49]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
MC19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
IE25.11.2017
LU25.11.2017
MT25.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/45]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
MC19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
IE25.11.2017
LU25.11.2017
MT25.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/43]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
MC19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
LU25.11.2017
MT25.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/41]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
MC19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
LU25.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/33]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
MC19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/25]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
SM19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RS19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
HR19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
NO19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL19.04.2017
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP2061192  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0202] * * paragraph [0226] * * claims 1-9 *;
 [Y]  - Daniel Crespo Ramirez, "Smartphone traffic patterns", (20110717), URL: http://kth.diva-portal.org/smash/get/diva2:507877/FULLTEXT01.pdf, (20130705), XP055069991 [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [2.1.4.1] * * paragraph [03.1] - paragraph [03.3] *
 [Y]  - FENG QIAN ET AL, "TOP: Tail Optimization Protocol For Cellular Radio Resource Allocation", NETWORK PROTOCOLS (ICNP), 2010 18TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20101005), doi:10.1109/ICNP.2010.5762777, ISBN 978-1-4244-8644-1, pages 285 - 294, XP031864737 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICNP.2010.5762777
International search[Y]EP1589403  (SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US])
 [X]  - DANIEL CRESPO RAMIREZ, "Smartphone traffic patterns", DEGREE PROJECT IN COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS SECOND LEVEL, 30.0 HEC, STOCKHOLM, SWEDEN, (20110717), URL: http://kth.diva- portal.org/smash/record.jsf?pid=diva2:507877&rvn=1, XP055069991
by applicantEP2061192
    - DANIEL CRESPO RAMIREZ, SMARTPHONE TRAFFIC PATTERNS